The Travelers Idemnity Company of Connecticut et al v. All Season Plumbing, Heating and Air Conditioning, Inc.
Plaintiff: The Standard Fire Insurance Company, The Travelers Idemnity Company of Connecticut and The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Defendant: All Season Plumbin, Heating, and Air Conditioning, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01878
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference for Wednesday, October 16, 2019; parties shall submit their ex parte submissions by October 2, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 8/13/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms for Settlement. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 8/1/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING #9 Status Report. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 8/1/2019. (rass, Chambers)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 Status Report Submitted as initial report requested by 8/05 per Scheduling Order by The Travelers Idemnity Company of Connecticut (Corso, Scarlett)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 12/4/2019. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 7/22/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by All Season Plumbin, Heating, and Air Conditioning, Inc. (Byers, Larissa)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by All Season Plumbin, Heating, and Air Conditioning, Inc..(Byers, Larissa)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 Supplemental to (Byers, Larissa)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Interrogatories, and Request for Production of Documents served on Teresa Ryder at All Season Plumbing, Heating & Air Conditioning, Inc. on 06/28/2019, filed by The Travelers Idemnity Company of Connecticut. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(Corso, Scarlett)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to All Season Plumbin, Heating, and Air Conditioning, Inc..(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Standard Fire Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The Travelers Idemnity Company of Connecticut identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Other Affiliate Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. for The Standard Fire Insurance Company, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The Travelers Idemnity Company of Connecticut.(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Season Plumbin, Heating, and Air Conditioning, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637116001.), filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The Travelers Idemnity Company of Connecticut, The Standard Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(jb5, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Travelers Idemnity Company of Connecticut et al v. All Season Plumbing, Heating and Air Conditioning, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Scarlett Marcella Corso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Travelers Idemnity Company of Connecticut
Represented By: Scarlett Marcella Corso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Scarlett Marcella Corso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Season Plumbin, Heating, and Air Conditioning, Inc.
Represented By: Larissa N Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?