March v. Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority et al.
Plaintiff: Melvin March
Defendant: WMATA, Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority and Raneshia Shernette Allen
Case Number: 8:2019cv01969
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Referring Judge: Gina L Simms
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM ORDER to parties regarding referral for all further proceedings; Parties are directed to file their consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge forms within Fourteen (14) days of the Order ECF No. 17; the Scheduling Order entered by Judge Grim on 7/10/2019 ECF No. 8 will continue to govern this case. Joint Status Report is due by December 17, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 8/5/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Directing Parties to Submit Magistrate Judge Consent Form(s) re #16 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/31/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms for all Proceedings. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/31/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 Status Conference held on 7/30/2019 before Judge Paul W. Grimm. (ats, Chambers)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER RESCHEDULING Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 telephone conference call TO July 30, 2019 at 4:00pm. Counsel should use the conference call number provided in the letter order at ECF No. 10. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/18/2019. (ats, Chambers)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 Correspondence re: Rescheduling July 25, 2019 Phone Conference (Myers, Zachary)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 Correspondence re: Disclosure of Damages and Relief Sought (Myers, Zachary)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Myers on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Myers, Zachary)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER ORDER scheduling a telephone conference call for July 25, 2019 at 4:30 PM. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/10/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) cm on 7/12/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Initial Discovery Protocols)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) cm on 7/12/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 12/17/2019. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/10/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) cm on 7/12/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/5/2019. (c/m 7/5/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/5/2019. (c/m 7/5/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 Removal Notification Letter (c/m 7/5/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT FROM STATE COURT against Raneshia Shernette Allen and Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority, filed by Melvin March. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
July 3, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by WMATA identifying Corporate Parent WMATA for WMATA.(Chandonnet, Brendan)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by WMATA.(Chandonnet, Brendan) Modified on 7/5/2019 (km4s, Deputy Clerk).
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George'sCounty, case number CAL19-13733. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8105363), filed by WMATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chandonnet, Brendan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: March v. Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WMATA
Represented By: Brendan H Chandonnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority
Represented By: Brendan H Chandonnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raneshia Shernette Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin March
Represented By: Zachary Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?