Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Joy et al
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Gia Colette Wigglesworth, Chibria Hicks-Wigglesworth and Christina M. Joy
Case Number: 8:2019cv02034
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Gia Colette Wigglesworth answer is deemed timely filed as of 8/15/2019. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/27/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Gia Colette Wigglesworth. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Gia Colette Wigglesworth. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 6, 2019 Check Received on 7/31/2019 from Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Check Number: 002356797. Amount: $$38,780.88. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of William Perry. Directing attorney William Perry to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/1/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William J. Perry (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8152155.) by Chibria Hicks-Wigglesworth, Christina M. Joy(Valle, Diana)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Chibria Hicks-Wigglesworth waiver sent on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019.(Aguirre, Samir)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Christina M. Joy waiver sent on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019.(Aguirre, Samir)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Gia Colette Wigglesworth served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019.(Aguirre, Samir)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Deposit Funds. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/15/2019. (kns, Deputy Clerk)(c/e-m Finance 7/16/19)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/12/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued 21 days as to Chibria Hicks-Wigglesworth, Christina M. Joy and Gia Colette Wigglesworth. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company re #1 Complaint (Summons - Gia Wigglesworth) (Aguirre, Samir)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company re #1 Complaint (Summons - C. Hicks Wigglesworth) (Aguirre, Samir)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company re #1 Complaint (Summons - Christina Joy) (Aguirre, Samir)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Deposit Funds by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aguirre, Samir)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Aguirre, Samir)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8117750.), filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Aguirre, Samir)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Joy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gia Colette Wigglesworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chibria Hicks-Wigglesworth
Represented By: Diana Carolina Valle
Represented By: William John Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina M. Joy
Represented By: Diana Carolina Valle
Represented By: William John Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Samir Alfonso Aguirre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?