Ossai v. Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority et al
Plaintiff: Grace Ossai
Defendant: Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority and Tanisha Pearson
Case Number: 8:2019cv02048
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Referring Judge: Timothy J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER approving #22 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Tanesha Pearson Only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 9/25/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 24, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION of Dismissal of claims against Defendant Tanesha Pearson by Tanisha Pearson, Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority(Cuthbertson, James)
September 13, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Grace Ossai.(Sobo, Mark)
September 6, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Tanisha Pearson (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cuthbertson, James)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day for Mediation. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/6/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
August 30, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority of Consent to Reference to a Magistrate Judge (Cuthbertson, James)
August 30, 2019 Filing 17 STATUS REPORT by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority(Cuthbertson, James)
August 30, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority. (Cuthbertson, James)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that by August 30, 2019 parties shall submit a Joint Status Report; Granting defendant Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority leave to file an Amended Answer. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/29/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 Case Management Conference held on 8/23/2019 before Judge Theodore D. Chuang.(FTR-2A) (ss5s, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Tanisha Pearson of Intent to File Motion to Dismiss (Cuthbertson, James)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice #4 Motion to Dismiss; Pearson is directed to file a Notice of Intent to File a Motion; Pre-Motion conference is scheduled for August 23, 2019 at 4:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/31/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Tanisha Pearson, Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority of Statement re Removal (Cuthbertson, James)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/12/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Standing Order Concerning Removal re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/12/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (5-8) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 State Court of Interrogatories by Grace Ossai (heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 STATE COURT Request for Interpreter. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT Summons Issued 30 days as to Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority.(heps, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 7/12/2019 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COMPLAINT against Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority, filed by Grace Ossai. (Attachments: #1 Case Information Report)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by tanisha pearson (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Chandonnet, Brendan)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by WMATA identifying Corporate Parent WMATA for WMATA.(Chandonnet, Brendan)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by WMATA.(Chandonnet, Brendan)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George'sCounty, case number Cal19-13724. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8120172), filed by WMATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chandonnet, Brendan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ossai v. Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority
Represented By: James Douglas Cuthbertson
Represented By: Brendan H Chandonnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanisha Pearson
Represented By: James Douglas Cuthbertson
Represented By: Brendan H Chandonnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Ossai
Represented By: Mark Muyiwa Sobo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?