Eghrari-Sabet v. ENT, Allergy and Asthma Center, PC
Plaintiff: JACQUELINE EGHRARI-SABET
Defendant: ENT, ALLERGY, AND ASTHMA CENTER, PC and ENT, Allergy and Asthma Center, PC
Case Number: 8:2019cv02055
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Charles B Day
Referring Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ENT, Allergy and Asthma Center, PC.(Gebhardt, Joseph)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jacqueline Eghrari-Sabet.(Deitch, David)
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Jacqueline Eghrari-Sabet of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Count III (Tortious Interference) (Deitch, David)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Directing attorney David B. Deitch to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 8/13/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David B. Deitch (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8171074.) by Jacqueline Eghrari-Sabet(Leonard, Declan)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by ENT, Allergy and Asthma Center, PC (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gebhardt, Joseph)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph D Gebhardt on behalf of ENT, Allergy and Asthma Center, PC (Gebhardt, Joseph)
July 29, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 7/16/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day. Jacqueline Eghrari-Sabet or counsel for Jacqueline Eghrari-Sabet are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 7/30/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to ENT, Allergy and Asthma Center, PC.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Jacqueline Eghrari-Sabet re #1 Complaint, (Leonard, Declan)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Jacqueline Eghrari-Sabet was filed with the following attachment missing - Proposed Summons. To correct this problem, file Proposed Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Summons to #1 Complaint. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ENT, ALLERGY, AND ASTHMA CENTER, PC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8121653.), filed by JACQUELINE EGHRARI-SABET. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Leonard, Declan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eghrari-Sabet v. ENT, Allergy and Asthma Center, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACQUELINE EGHRARI-SABET
Represented By: Declan Christopher Leonard
Represented By: David Deitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENT, ALLERGY, AND ASTHMA CENTER, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENT, Allergy and Asthma Center, PC
Represented By: Joseph D Gebhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?