Heroman v. Teaching Strategies, LLC
Plaintiff: Catherine Heroman
Defendant: Teaching Strategies, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv02098
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 19 CORRECTED EXHIBIT from Earlier Submission: #18 Amended Complaint Exhibit 3 (Berman, Stuart) Modified on 9/6/2019 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
September 6, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Teaching Strategies, LLC, filed by Catherine Heroman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 (FILED IN ERROR BY COUNSEL), #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Attachment Redlined version)(Berman, Stuart) Modified on 9/6/2019 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER memorializing this afternoon's telephone conference call with counsel. Plaintiff's counsel expressed an interest in filing an amended complaint in response to arguments raised in Defendant's pre-motion letter. Counsel agreed to file the amended complaint by 9/6/19. Defendant's motion to dismiss the amended complaint will be due 9/27/19. Plaintiff's response in opposition to the motion will be due 10/18/19, and Defendant's reply will be due 11/1/19. The parties agreed to the following page limits: 25 pages for the motion, 25 for the opposition, and 15 for the reply. (Note: The page limits do not include exhibits.) I would appreciate it if the parties would highlight the key language in any exhibits they may attach to their memoranda. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/27/2019. (sb2s, Chambers)
August 27, 2019 Filing 16 Status Conference held on 8/27/2019 before Judge Paul W. Grimm. (ats, Chambers)
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of James R Chastain. Directing attorney James R Chastain to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/21/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James R. Chastain, Jr. (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8188328.) by Catherine Heroman(Berman, Stuart)
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Maria Pellegrino Rivera. Directing attorney Maria Pellegrino Rivera to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/20/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Brian Sieve. Directing attorney Brian Sieve to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/19/2019. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING A PRE-MOTION TELEPHONE CONFERENCE on August 27, 2019 at 3:00pm AND DIRECTING Defendant's counsel to initiate the call to chambers or circulate a conference call number to the parties. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/16/2019. (ats, Chambers)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Conference (Draper, Kristin)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Maria Pellegrino Rivera (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8179596.) by Teaching Strategies, LLC(Draper, Kristin)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brian D. Sieve (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8179588.) by Teaching Strategies, LLC(Draper, Kristin)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Teaching Strategies, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TSB Parent Holdings, L.P., Corporate Parent TSB Intermediate, Inc., Corporate Parent UTJ Holdco, Inc., Other Affiliate Mindnuture, LLC, Other Affiliate Tadpoles, LLC, Other Affiliate ReadyRosie, LLC, Other Affiliate WeeSchool, Inc. for Teaching Strategies, LLC.(Draper, Kristin)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Catherine Heroman. Teaching Strategies, LLC served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019.(Berman, Stuart)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 QC NOTICE: #4 Affidavit of Service filed by Catherine Heroman was filed incorrectly. **The incorrect docketing event was used. The correct event is Summons Returned Executed, which is located under Civil, Initial Pleadings and Service, Service of Process, and Summons Returned Executed. This event sets the answer due deadline. Please re-file your document using the correct civil event. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (rss, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, complaint and attachments served on The Corporate Trust, Inc. on July 24, 2019, filed by Catherine Heroman.(Berman, Stuart) Modified on 7/31/2019 (rss, Deputy Clerk).
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Teaching Strategies, LLC.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/17/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Teaching Strategies, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8129454.), filed by Catherine Heroman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)(Berman, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heroman v. Teaching Strategies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Heroman
Represented By: Stuart A Berman
Represented By: James R Chastain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teaching Strategies, LLC
Represented By: Kristin Elizabeth Draper
Represented By: Maria Pellegrino Rivera
Represented By: Brian D Sieve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?