Burgos-Lopez v. Turner
Plaintiff: Vidal Burgos-Lopez
Defendant: Belinda Brant Turner
Case Number: 8:2019cv02140
Filed: July 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Gina L Simms
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT - Rule 26(a)(1)(A)(iii) Statement by Vidal Burgos-Lopez(Kaminow, David)
September 18, 2019 Filing 17 STATUS REPORT Joint by Belinda Brant Turner(Thorstensen, Bjorn)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LETTER/ORDER scheduling a phone conference per Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 for September 20, 2019 at 10:00am. Parties are instructed to access the call by using the following: Phone number (888) 363-4735; Access code 8899912; Participant code: 0929. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 9/4/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 1/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 9/4/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DISCOVERY ORDER with attached Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 9/4/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 9/4/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 9/3/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: Belinda Brant Turner must correct the following error(s):**Incorrect form used - complete the form Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here and refile using the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Belinda Brant Turner or counsel for Belinda Brant Turner are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 9/5/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Belinda Brant Turner (Thorstensen, Bjorn)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Belinda Brant Turner.(Thorstensen, Bjorn)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 7/22/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Vidal Burgos-Lopez or counsel for Vidal Burgos-Lopez are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 8/5/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Belinda Brant Turner.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Belinda Brant Turner ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8135370.), filed by Vidal Burgos-Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kaminow, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burgos-Lopez v. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vidal Burgos-Lopez
Represented By: David Jason Kaminow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belinda Brant Turner
Represented By: Bjorn Erik Thorstensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?