Starr et al v. VSL Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James Tettenhorst, Rabbi David Starr, Krista Karo, Jeremy Hansen, edmund quiambao, bernadette mavrikos, Arlene Reed-Cossairt, sandi cook and David Starr
Defendant: Leadiant Biosciences, Inc., VSL Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Alfasigma USA, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv02173
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Referring Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/31/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Alfasigma USA, Inc., Leadiant Biosciences, Inc. and VSL Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Sandi Cook, Jeremy Hansen, Krista Karo, Bernadette Mavrikos, Edmund Quiambao, Arlene Reed-Cossairt, David Starr, James Tettenhorst re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Schulman, Jeremy)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 QC NOTICE regarding: #1 Complaint, filed by Arlene Reed-Cossairt, James Tettenhorst, David Starr, Edmund Quiambao, Sandi Cook, Bernadette Mavrikos, Krista Karo, Jeremy Hansen. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summonses. To correct this problem, file Summonses using the event Notice (Other) and link Summonses to #1 Complaint. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
July 24, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. Judge Paula Xinis no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (class action) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8139963.), filed by Jeremy Hansen, bernadette mavrikos, Krista Karo, sandi cook, Arlene Reed-Cossairt, David Starr, edmund quiambao, James Tettenhorst. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulman, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starr et al v. VSL Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Tettenhorst
Represented By: Jeremy W Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rabbi David Starr
Represented By: Jeremy W Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krista Karo
Represented By: Jeremy W Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Hansen
Represented By: Jeremy W Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: edmund quiambao
Represented By: Jeremy W Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: bernadette mavrikos
Represented By: Jeremy W Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Reed-Cossairt
Represented By: Jeremy W Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: sandi cook
Represented By: Jeremy W Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Starr
Represented By: Jeremy W Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leadiant Biosciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VSL Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfasigma USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?