S.F. et al v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: J. F. and S. F.
Defendant: MONTGOMERY COUNTY BOARD OF EDUCATION, Dr. Jack R. Smith and Jack R. Smith
Case Number: 8:2019cv02207
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER memorializing today's conference call with counsel. The parties will be filing cross motions for summary judgment under Local Rule 105.2(c). Plaintiff will file a motion for summary judgment by December 2, 2019. Defendants will file a combined opposition and cross motion for summary judgment by January 17, 2020. Plaintiff will file a combined reply and opposition by February 18, 2020. Defendants will file a reply by March 19, 2020. Each party will have 55 pages of substantive briefing total across all submissions, excluding exhibits. The parties are directed to please highlight relevant portions of the exhibits to aid the Court's review. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/20/2019. (pk3s, Chambers)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Manisha S Kavadi on behalf of All Defendants (Kavadi, Manisha)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Order Protocol)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 2/12/2020. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/22/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 telephone conference call on September 20, 2019 at 1:30pm AND DIRECTING Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call to chambers or circulate a conference call number to the parties. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/23/2019. (ats, Chambers)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Montgomery County Board of Education, Jack R. Smith (Rachlin, Emily)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Montgomery County Board of Education, Jack R. Smith.(Rachlin, Emily)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 Administrative Record of Proceedings. (heps, Deputy Clerk)(filed separately under seal)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Consent Motion to Proceed Anonymously. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/31/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/31/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Montgomery County Board of Education, Jack R. Smith.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by S. F., J. F. was filed incorrectly. **Not all attorneys listed as counsel have signed the document. Court staff has entered the appearance of only the attorneys who have signed the document. All other attorneys must enter their own entries of appearance. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 Consent MOTION TO PROCEED ANONYMOUSLY AND TO SEAL THE COMPLAINT AND ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by J. F., S. F.(A minor by her parents and next friends), S. F. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Complaint)(Eig, Michael)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MONTGOMERY COUNTY BOARD OF EDUCATION, Jack R. Smith ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8149516.), filed by S. F.(A minor by her parents and next friends), J. F., S. F.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Eig, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S.F. et al v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONTGOMERY COUNTY BOARD OF EDUCATION
Represented By: Emily B Rachlin
Represented By: Manisha S Kavadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jack R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack R. Smith
Represented By: Emily B Rachlin
Represented By: Manisha S Kavadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. F.
Represented By: Michael J Eig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. F.
Represented By: Michael J Eig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?