Washburn v. Nunez et al
Plaintiff: Choo Washburn
Defendant: John Nunez and Bethesda-Chevy Chase Builders, LLC.
Case Number: 8:2019cv02227
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 Petition for Request to Order Marshal to Serve Summons by Choo Washburn (heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 27, 2019 Filing 13 Petition Request to Extend for Serving Summons by Choo Washburn (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 Notice to Withdraw #7 MOTION for Refund of Filing Fee by Choo Washburn. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 Notice to Withdraw #6 Withdraw Motion for Alternative Service (Marshal to Serve Complaint) by Choo Washburn. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE to Withdraw #5 Motion to withdraw/Close case. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #4 Order to Show Cause regarding jurisdiction over the case filed by Choo Washburn. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 Amended Civil Cover Sheet by Choo Washburn re #1 Complaint, (heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Refund of Filing Fee by Choo Washburn (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Withdraw Motion for Alternative Service by Choo Washburn (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Withdraw/Close Case by Choo Washburn (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that within Fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order Plaintiff shall show cause as to why the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this case. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/5/2019. (c/m 8/5/2019 heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/2/2019. (c/m 8/2/2019 heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Petition to Deliver/Serve Summon to the Defendant by Marshal by Choo Washburn(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bethesda-Chevy Chase Builders, LLC., John Nunez ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 84637034760.),filed by Choo Washburn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 REF. #1, REF. #2a, #3 REF. #2, #4 REF. #3, #5 REF. #4, #6 REF. #5, #7 REF. #6, #8 REF. #7, #9 REF. #8, #10 REF. #9, #11 REF. #10, #12 REF. #10a, #13 REF. #10b, #14 REF. #11 & #12, #15 Summons)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washburn v. Nunez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Choo Washburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethesda-Chevy Chase Builders, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?