Vista Partners, Inc. v. BrainScope Company, Inc.

Plaintiff: Vista Partners, Inc.
Defendant: BrainScope Company, Inc.
Special Master: Maura R. Grossman
Case Number: 8:2019cv02238
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Greenbelt Office
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 PAPERLESS ORDER. Within 14 days of the date of this order, the parties shall FILE a Joint Status Report informing the Court of the status of this case and whether Defendant BrainScope Company plans to file an answer or other responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/7/2019. (sl5s, Chambers)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/7/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 7, 2019 Filing 87 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:19-cv-00138. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Plaintiff's Objection (Doc. #73 ) to the Recommendation is OVERRULED; The Recommendation (Doc. #68 ) of Magistrate Judge Crews is AFFIRMED AND ADOPTED IN PART as an Order of this Court; Defendant's Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) (Doc. #24 ) is GRANTED; and Plaintiff's action shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Maryland, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/5/2019. (evana, )
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received confirmation from the Special Master that her invoices have been paid. Consequently, the #83 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. In the event this Court retains jurisdiction over this case and the Special Master performs further service, the Parties are reminded that prompt payment is required as an Order of the Court. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 8/5/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
July 22, 2019 Filing 84 RESPONSE to #83 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiff Vista Partners, Inc.. (Lico, Joseph)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: On or before JULY 23, 2019, Vista Partners shall SHOW CAUSE IN WRITING why it should not be held in contempt of Court for directly violating this Courts order to remit prompt payment to the Special Master. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 7/16/2019. (skclc1)
July 16, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE TO THE COURT: Regarding Plaintiff's failure to remit payment. Docketed by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 7/16/2019 on behalf of Special Master Maura R. Grossman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Correspondence and Invoices) (skclc1)
July 5, 2019 Filing 81 Joint MOTION to Continue All Deadlines by Plaintiff Vista Partners, Inc. and by Defendant BrainScope Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Golimowski, Jeffrey)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #69 Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer, by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/26/2019.(jgonz, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 79 TRANSCRIPT of Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference held on February 28, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Crews. Pages: 1-42. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 78 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant BrainScope Company, Inc.. (Golimowski, Jeffrey)
May 3, 2019 Filing 77 TRANSCRIPT of TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 02/28/2019 before Magistrate Judge Crews. Pages: 1-44. Prepared by: AB Court Reporting & Video, Inc.. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (AB Court Reporting & Video, Inc., )
May 1, 2019 Filing 76 RESPONSE to Objection to #68 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #24 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by BrainScope Company, Inc. filed by Defendant BrainScope Company, Inc.. (Golimowski, Jeffrey)
May 1, 2019 Filing 75 REPLY to Response to #69 First MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Defendant BrainScope Company, Inc.. (Golimowski, Jeffrey)
April 26, 2019 Filing 74 RESPONSE to #69 First MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Plaintiff Vista Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Minutes of Special Master, #2 Exhibit 2 Hospital Notice)(Kennedy, Jason)
April 25, 2019 Filing 73 OBJECTION to #68 Report and Recommendations on Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue [ECF #24] filed by Plaintiff Vista Partners, Inc.. (Kennedy, Jason)
April 18, 2019 Filing 72 TRANSCRIPT of TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 03/11/2019 before Magistrate Judge Crews. Pages: 1-42. Prepared by: AB Court Reporting & Video, Inc.. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (AB Court Reporting & Video, Inc., )
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE ORDER: In light of the pending #68 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #24 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and the recently filed #69 First MOTION to Stay Discovery, the Status Conference set for April 24, 2019, is VACATED and will be reset at a future date if necessary. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a Response to the Motion to Stay on or before April 26, 2019. Defendant may file a Reply no later than seven (7) days following service of the Response. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 4/17/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
April 16, 2019 Filing 70 MEMORANDUM regarding #69 First MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by BrainScope Company, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/16/2019. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
April 15, 2019 Filing 69 First MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendant BrainScope Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Golimowski, Jeffrey)
April 11, 2019 Filing 68 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: For the reasons stated herein, the Court RECOMMENDS that the #24 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by BrainScope Company, Inc. be GRANTED. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 4/11/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER re #64 Motion to Expedite. The Court previously concluded that further briefing was unnecessary and vacated the forthcoming evidentiary hearing. Thus, the present request is moot. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 4/8/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
April 8, 2019 Filing 66 MEMORANDUM regarding #64 First MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule for #60 Motion to Continue Evidentiary Hearing filed by BrainScope Company, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/8/2019. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER re #60 Motion to Continue. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(d), a judicial officer may rule on a motion any time after it is filed. The Court concludes that further briefing on this issue is not necessary. This Court previously determined that a limited amount of discovery was warranted prior to the preliminary injunction evidentiary hearing. It is apparent from the recent disputes, the Motion, and correspondence with the Special Master that the parties' discovery efforts are only in the beginning stages. Further, in light of Plaintiff's request that the Motion to Transfer be referred to the Magistrate Judge, and Judge Arguello's recent reference of the matter, the Court concludes that the most prudent course of action at this time is to reschedule the evidentiary hearing to a time following the resolution of these various issues. Therefore, IT IS ORDERED that the Evidentiary Hearing set for April 24, 2019 at 8:30AM is CONVERTED to a Status Conference. The purpose of the conference will be to discuss the case and choose a new date for the hearing. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 4/5/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
April 5, 2019 Filing 64 First MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule for #60 Motion to Continue Evidentiary Hearing by Defendant BrainScope Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Golimowski, Jeffrey)
April 4, 2019 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM regarding #26 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by BrainScope Company, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/4/2019. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
April 4, 2019 Filing 62 MEMORANDUM regarding #24 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by BrainScope Company, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/4/2019. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
April 3, 2019 Filing 61 MEMORANDUM regarding #60 First MOTION to Continue Evidentiary Hearing filed by BrainScope Company, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/3/2019. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
April 3, 2019 Filing 60 First MOTION to Continue Evidentiary Hearing by Defendant BrainScope Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Golimowski, Jeffrey)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 PROTECTIVE ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 4/3/2019. (skclc1)
March 29, 2019 Filing 58 RESPONSE to #53 Order, Joint Proposed Protective Order by Defendant BrainScope Company, Inc.. (Golimowski, Jeffrey)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiff's Reply is accepted as filed. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 3/28/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Refer Venue Question to Magistrate Judge. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/28/2019. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
March 26, 2019 Filing 55 REPLY to Response to #24 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Defendant BrainScope Company, Inc.. (Golimowski, Jeffrey)
March 26, 2019 Filing 54 REPLY to Response to #26 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant BrainScope Company, Inc.. (Golimowski, Jeffrey)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 AMENDED ORDER (amended to include attachment): For the reasons stated herein, the Court is not persuaded that an umbrella protective order is justified, and therefore, the 48 Motion for Protective Order is denied. The parties shall confer and submit a joint blanket protective order on or before March 29, 2019. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 3/25/2019. (skclc1) By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 3/25/2019. (skclc1, )
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: For the reasons stated herein, the Court is not persuaded that an umbrella protective order is justified, and therefore, the #48 Motion for Protective Order is denied. The parties shall confer and submit a joint blanket protective order on or before March 29, 2019. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 3/25/2019. (skclc1)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER appointing Maura R. Grossman as Special Master. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 3/25/2019. (skclc1)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM regarding #48 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Vista Partners, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/25/2019. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
March 22, 2019 Filing 49 OBJECTIONS to #45 Minute Order Plaintiffs Objections to Appointment of Sepcial Master by Plaintiff Vista Partners, Inc.. (Kennedy, Jason)
March 22, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Vista Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant's Requests for Production, #2 Exhibit Vista's Written Discovery Requests, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Kennedy, Jason)
March 22, 2019 Filing 47 RESPONSE to #45 Minute Order Regarding Appointment of Special Master by Defendant BrainScope Company, Inc.. (Golimowski, Jeffrey)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER re: #45 NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL MASTER. The affidavit of Maura R. Grossman, regarding her potential appointment as special master, is attached hereto. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 3/18/2019. (skclc1)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING APPOINTMENT OF MASTER by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 3/18/2019. (skclc1)
March 15, 2019 Filing 44 RESPONSE to #43 Notice (Other) by Defendant BrainScope Company, Inc.. (Golimowski, Jeffrey)
March 15, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE re #40 Discovery Hearing Plaintiffs Notice Regarding Estimated Costs of E.S.I. Vendors by Plaintiff Vista Partners, Inc. (Kennedy, Jason)
March 12, 2019 Filing 42 RESPONSE to #24 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Plaintiff Vista Partners, Inc.. (Kennedy, Jason)
March 12, 2019 Filing 41 RESPONSE to #25 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), #26 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Plaintiff Vista Partners, Inc.. (Kennedy, Jason)
March 11, 2019 Filing 40 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews: Discovery Hearing held on 3/11/2019. FTR: Courtroom C-204. (amont, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE re 37 Minute Order,, Plaintiffs Legal Authority for Informal Discovery Conference of March 11, 2019 by Plaintiff Vista Partners, Inc. (Kennedy, Jason)
March 8, 2019 Filing 38 STATEMENT of Legal Authority in Support of Its Discovery Position by Defendant BrainScope Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Golimowski, Jeffrey)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER: An informal Discovery Conference is set for 3/11/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Upon further consideration, the Court concludes that full discovery briefs are not necessary; however, if the parties have legal authority to support their respective positions they shall file it no later than 5:00 pm on 3/8/2019. These submissions shall be no longer than 3 pages, double-spaced. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 3/7/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER Setting Evidentiary Hearing on Plaintiff's Preliminary Injunction #2 . An Evidentiary Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #2 is set for 4/24/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The Court considered the dates requested by both parties and determined that the discovery needs on this issue necessitates a hearing in late April. A continuance of the Hearing will not be granted due to the stress of discovery alone. Therefore, the parties shall conduct the discovery allowed by this Court's Minute Order (ECF. #32) with diligence and in good faith. At the hearing, counsel shall be prepared to call witnesses, offer relevant exhibits, and make arguments. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 3/6/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Vista Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email from BrainScope)(Kennedy, Jason)
March 4, 2019 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM regarding #33 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Reply Supporting Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Vista Partners, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/4/2019. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
March 4, 2019 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Reply Supporting Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Vista Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Granting Leave to File 15 Page Reply Brief)(Kennedy, Jason)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Vista Partners, Inc.: The Court will hold an evidentiary hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction #2 . The hearing will occur in April. Prior to the hearing, each party shall be entitled to take no more than two depositions the scope of which shall be limited to the issues to be presented at the hearing. These depositions shall each be limited to no more than four hours. At the hearing, counsel shall be prepared to call witnesses, offer relevant exhibits, and make arguments. Counsel is ORDERED to jointly contact my chambers by no later than March 6, 2019, to set a date(s) for the hearing. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 3/4/2019. Text Only Entry (skc)
March 1, 2019 Filing 31 BRIEF in Opposition to #30 Unopposed MOTION for Referral of Venue Question to Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant BrainScope Company, Inc.. (Golimowski, Jeffrey)
March 1, 2019 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Referral of Venue Question to Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Vista Partners, Inc.. (Kennedy, Jason)
February 28, 2019 Filing 29 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews: Scheduling Conference held on 2/28/2019. Discovery due by 9/6/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 10/7/2019. Joint Status Report due by 5/24/2019. Telephone Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/11/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Counsel participating in the conference shall jointly call the Court (303.335.2124) at the scheduled time. FTR: Courtroom C-204. (amont, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph J. Lico on behalf of Vista Partners, Inc.Attorney Joseph J. Lico added to party Vista Partners, Inc.(pty:pla) (Lico, Joseph)
February 27, 2019 Filing 27 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Vista Partners, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Kennedy, Jason)
February 26, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Defendant BrainScope Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Golimowski, Jeffrey)
February 26, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Defendant BrainScope Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Toll, Christopher) Modified on 2/27/2019 to note that this document was re-filed as doc #26 (athom, ).
February 26, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Defendant BrainScope Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lou, Melissa)
February 22, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gary Howard Nunes on behalf of BrainScope Company, Inc.Attorney Gary Howard Nunes added to party BrainScope Company, Inc.(pty:dft) (Nunes, Gary)
February 22, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Golimowski on behalf of BrainScope Company, Inc.Attorney Jeffrey J. Golimowski added to party BrainScope Company, Inc.(pty:dft) (Golimowski, Jeffrey)
February 21, 2019 Filing 21 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Vista Partners, Inc.. (Kennedy, Jason)
February 21, 2019 Filing 20 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #18 Notice of Entry of Appearance, #19 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Jeffrey J. Golimowski; Gary Howard Nunes. Attorneys have failed to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR5.1(a) and 4.3(d) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases), which mandate the correct form for an attorneys signature block. These documents do not have a s/ signature and must be re-filed. (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gary Howard Nunes on behalf of BrainScope Company, Inc.Attorney Gary Howard Nunes added to party BrainScope Company, Inc.(pty:dft) (Nunes, Gary)
February 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Golimowski on behalf of BrainScope Company, Inc.Attorney Jeffrey J. Golimowski added to party BrainScope Company, Inc.(pty:dft) (Golimowski, Jeffrey)
February 18, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant BrainScope Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 510K Statement, #2 Exhibit B - SOW2, #3 Exhibit C - Sports Proposal, #4 Exhibit D - Email Myers to Brainscope, #5 Exhibit E - ProPublica Story 2011)(Lou, Melissa)
January 30, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant BrainScope Company, Inc.. BrainScope Company, Inc. answer due 2/26/2019. (Lou, Melissa)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and #13 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction : Brainscope Company, Inc. may have an extension, up to and including February 18, 2019, to file a Response, not exceeding 25 pages, to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/30/2019. (skclc1) Modified on 2/4/2019 to link motions (jgonz, ).
January 30, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM regarding #13 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by BrainScope Company, Inc., #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by BrainScope Company, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/30/2019. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
January 29, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant BrainScope Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Lou, Melissa)
January 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant BrainScope Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Lou, Melissa)
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Melissa Y. Lou on behalf of BrainScope Company, Inc.Attorney Melissa Y. Lou added to party BrainScope Company, Inc.(pty:dft) (Lou, Melissa)
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher Hulbert Toll on behalf of BrainScope Company, Inc.Attorney Christopher Hulbert Toll added to party BrainScope Company, Inc.(pty:dft) (Toll, Christopher)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Scheduling Conference set for 2/28/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/22/19. (amont, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vista Partners, Inc.. BrainScope Company, Inc. served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Kennedy, Jason)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM regarding #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Vista Partners, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/16/2019. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Magistrate Judge Crews is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/16/2019. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00138-CMA. (athom, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Vista Partners, Inc.. (Kennedy, Jason)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BrainScope Company, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6486087)Attorney Jason Carl Kennedy added to party Vista Partners, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Vista Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Confidentiality Agreement, 2014, #2 Exhibit Collaboration Agreement, #3 Exhibit Confidentiality Agreement, 2015, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Summons to BrainScope Company, Inc.)(Kennedy, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vista Partners, Inc. v. BrainScope Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vista Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Jason C. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BrainScope Company, Inc.
Represented By: Gary H. Nunes
Represented By: Jeff Golimowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Maura R. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?