Green v. 1900 Capital Trust II, BY U.S. BANK TRUST NewRez LLC
Appellant: Daryl Anthony Green
Appellee: 1900 Capital Trust II, BY U.S. BANK TRUST NewRez LLC
Trustee: Timothy P. Branigan
Case Number: 8:2019cv02270
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 APPELLANT'S DESIGNATION of Record and Statement of Issues on Appeal from U.S. Bankruptcy Court by Daryl Anthony Green re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal; RESPONSE to #5 Order entered by the Honorable Theodore D. Chuang on 9/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 BK #25 Objection to Confirmation of Plan, #2 BK #25-1 Exhibit A, #3 BK #25-2 Exhibit B, #4 BK #25-3 Exhibit C, #5 BK #28 Objection to Claim Number 4, #6 BK #28-1 Notice of Objection to Claim, #7 BK #28-2 Exhibit, #8 BK #28-3 Exhibit, #9 BK #28-4 Exhibit, #10 BK #28-5 Exhibit, #11 BK #28-6 Exhibit, #12 BK #28-7 Exhibit, #13 BK #28-8 Exhibit, #14 BK #28-9 Exhibit, #15 BK #28-10 Exhibit, #16 BK #28-11 Exhibit, #17 BK #28-12 Exhibit, #18 BK #28-13 Exhibit, #19 BK #28-14 Exhibit, #20 BK #28-15 Exhibit, #21 BK #28-16 Exhibit, #22 BK #28-17 Exhibit, #23 BK #28-18 Exhibit, #24 BK #28-19 Exhibit, #25 BK #29 Response to Objection to Plan, #26 BK #39 Response to Objection to Claim Number 4, #27 BK #40 Order Overruling Claim Objection, #28 BK #55 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #29 BK #56 Order Denying Application to Proceed without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #30 Docket Sheet, #31 BK #73-1 Transmittal Sheet dated 9/24/2019, #32 BK #74 Copy of Designation of Record originally filed in USDC, #33 BK #75-1 Transmittal Sheet dated 9/25/2019, #34 BK #76-1 Transmittal Sheet dated 9/26/2019)(kns, Deputy Clerk)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that within Ten (10) days from the date of this Order Appellant must submit the designation and statement to the Court and must also submit a statement explaining his prolonged delay in filing those documents. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/5/2019. (c/m 9/6/2019 heps, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/6/2019 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Transmittal of Record re #1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(jf3, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daryl Anthony Green (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Notification Letter (c/m ybs, Deputy Clerk)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. (Greenbelt). Bankruptcy Court case number 19-13565,, filed by Daryl Anthony Green. (Attachments: #1 Order being appealed, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Transmittal Sheet)(ybs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. 1900 Capital Trust II, BY U.S. BANK TRUST NewRez LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Daryl Anthony Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: 1900 Capital Trust II, BY U.S. BANK TRUST NewRez LLC
Represented By: Daniel Alan Ross
Represented By: Richard J Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Timothy P. Branigan
Represented By: Timothy P Branigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?