Ricks et al v. Auto Giants Inc. of Temple Hills, Maryland et al
Plaintiff: Mrs. Ricks, Mr. Louis Ricks, III and Vicky Monrore-Ricks
Defendant: Auto Giants Inc. of Temple Hills, Maryland, Capital One National Association, The Warranty Group and Assurant, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv02276
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Recusal filed by Assurant, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spiker, James)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Assurant, Inc. In The Amended Complaint, Or In The Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement by Assurant, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Spiker, James)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER CORRECTING EARLIER SUBMISSION and noting that 7 Paperless Notice Requesting Status Report was FILED IN ERROR and should be disregarded. (rass, Chambers)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 PAPERLESS NOTICE REQUESTING STATUS REPORT and advising counsel/parties of record that, in reviewing the docket in this case, it appears that no activity has taken place since August 19, 2019. Counsel/parties of record should submit a Status Report in writing via electronic case filing as to the current status of this case as soon as possible, but by no later than close of business on Friday, September 27, 2019. (rass, Chambers)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Auto Giants Inc. of Temple Hills, Maryland, Capital One National Association and The Warranty Group, filed by Louis Ricks, III and Ricks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 Response re #2 Correspondence from the Court, and request to reassign to a different Judge by Vicky Monroe-Ricks(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Assurant, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Spiker, James)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Protective Order /Defendant Assurant, Inc.'s Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and (Order) Mandamus and Petition for Permanent and Final Restraining Order filed by Assurant, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Spiker, James)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James O Spiker, IV on behalf of Assurant, Inc. (Spiker, James)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Vincent McCarron on behalf of Assurant, Inc. (McCarron, Thomas)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 CORRESPONDENCE to Plaintiffs from Judge Messitte's Chambers directing Plaintiffs to take prompt steps to address certain deficiencies as noted within thirty (30) days. (c/m Pro Se Plaintiffs by Chambers) (rass, Chambers)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction And (Order) Mandamus And Petition For Permanent and Final Restraining Orders Relief on Motion by Ricks, Louis Ricks, III (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(ybs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ricks et al v. Auto Giants Inc. of Temple Hills, Maryland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mrs. Ricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Louis Ricks, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicky Monrore-Ricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Giants Inc. of Temple Hills, Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Warranty Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assurant, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Vincent McCarron
Represented By: James O Spiker, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?