Quade v. Croft et al
Plaintiff: Evan Croft, Gavin Morse (minor by mother and next friend Shannon Quade) and Shannon Quade
Defendant: Comcast of Virginia, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv02292
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Referring Judge: Charles B Day
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER ORDER regarding All Further Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 10/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Policy Memorandum)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day for all Proceedings. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/30/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 PAPERLESS NOTICE. In light of #10 Consent to Magistrate Judge, the October 25, 2019 Rule 16 Conference is CANCELLED, and will be rescheduled at the discretion of the presiding United States Magistrate Judge. (nrs, Chambers)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Dunn, Christopher)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Comcast of Virginia, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Comcast of Virginia, LLC, Other Affiliate Comcast Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Comcast Cable Communications, LLC for Comcast of Virginia, LLC.(Dunn, Christopher)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 2/26/2020. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/25/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER. Defendant Comcast of Virginia, LLC's Rule 103.3 Disclosure is incomplete. Comcast of Virginia identifies its sole member as Comcast Holdings Corporation but does not provide citizenship information for Comcast Holdings Corporation. In order for this Court to determine whether the parties in this action are diverse, Comcast of Virginia, LLC must provide that information. Carden v. Arkoma Associates, 494 U.S. 185, 195 (1990) ("[D]iversity jurisdiction in a suit by or against [an unincorporated] entity depends on the citizenship of 'all the members '")(citing Chapman v. Barney, 129 U.S. 677, 682 (1889)); Central West Virginia Energy Co. Inc. v. Mountain State Carbon, LLC, 636 F.3d 101, 103 (4th Cir. 2011) ("For purposes of diversity jurisdiction, the citizenship of a limited liability company is determined by the citizenship of all of its members[.]"). Comcast of Virginia, LLC is therefore ORDERED to SUPPLEMENT its Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure with the necessary information by September 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/25/19. (nrs, Chambers)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Evan Croft (Dunn, Christopher)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Comcast of Virginia, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Comcast of Virginia, LLC, Other Affiliate Comcast Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Comcast Cable Communications, LLC for Comcast of Virginia, LLC.(Dunn, Christopher)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Comcast of Virginia, LLC, Evan Croft.(Dunn, Christopher)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Comcast of Virginia, LLC and Evan Croft.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/20/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Evan Croft, Comcast of Virginia, LLC filed by Shannon Quade. (Filing Fee $400, Receipt No. 0416-8168376)(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Prayer for Jury Trial, #3 Summons Summons Comcast, #4 Summons Summons Croft)(Rosasco, Mark) Modified on 8/8/2019 (heps, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 8/9/2019 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quade v. Croft et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast of Virginia, LLC
Represented By: Christopher R Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evan Croft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gavin Morse (minor by mother and next friend Shannon Quade)
Represented By: Mark E Rosasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Quade
Represented By: Mark E Rosasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?