MB Realty Group, Inc. v. Dolgencorp, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: MB Realty Group, Inc.
Defendant: Sara Butler and Dolgencorp, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv02300
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Reissued as to Dolgencorp, Inc.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of George Farneth. Directing attorney George Farneth to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/26/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 Correspondence re: Summons renewal (Attachments: #1 Summons Renewal)(Arnsdorf, Ralph)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for George R. Farneth, II (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8194829.) by MB Realty Group, Inc.(Arnsdorf, Ralph)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Reissued as to Sara Butler, Dolgencorp, Inc.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Correspondence Correcting Earlier Submission: #2 Summons Issued (Attachments: #1 Summons Sara Butler, #2 Summons Dolgencorp)(Arnsdorf, Ralph)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by MB Realty Group, Inc. (Arnsdorf, Ralph)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Sara Butler, Dolgencorp, Inc..(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8170891.), filed by MB Realty Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Dolgencorp, #3 Summons Sara Butler)(Arnsdorf, Ralph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MB Realty Group, Inc. v. Dolgencorp, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgencorp, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MB Realty Group, Inc.
Represented By: Ralph L Arnsdorf
Represented By: George R Farneth, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?