McDonald v. Monje et al
Plaintiff: Laurel B McDonald and Laurel B. McDonald
Defendant: Ronald R Monje, B.B. Express, Inc., B.B. Express, LLC and Ronald R. Monje
Case Number: 8:2019cv02301
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 13 Consent Correspondence re: Joint Status Report (Boscolo, Benjamin)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion for extension. The Rule 16 conference call set for October 9, 2019 has been RESCHEDULED to October 16 at 11:00 a.m. Plaintiff should initiate call to Chambers at (301) 344-0653. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 10/3/2019. (tb2s, Chambers)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION Postponement of Rule 16 Conference Call by Laurel B. McDonald(Boscolo, Benjamin)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Discovery Motions. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 9/24/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 2/6/2020. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 9/24/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Laurel B. McDonald Consent Line of Interlineation (Boscolo, Benjamin)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 Correspondence re: Statement Regarding Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Friedman, Sanford)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 8/12/2019. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 PLEASE DISREGARD: FILED IN ERROR Summons Issued 21 days as to B.B. Express, Inc., Ronald R. Monje.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 8/12/2019 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk).
August 9, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against B.B. Express, Inc., Ronald R. Monje ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8171174.), filed by Laurel B. McDonald.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Paula Xinis. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by B.B. Express, Inc., Ronald R Monje (Friedman, Sanford)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by B.B. Express, Inc., Ronald R Monje.(Friedman, Sanford)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, case number CAL19-19285. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8171174), filed by B.B. Express, Inc., Ronald R Monje. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SCC Info for BB Express, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Signed Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Civil Domestic Information Report, #4 Exhibit Complaint, #5 Exhibit Line to Issue Summons, #6 Exhibit Summons, #7 Exhibit Entry of Appearance, #8 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Friedman, Sanford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald v. Monje et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurel B McDonald
Represented By: Shaketta Ayana Denson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurel B. McDonald
Represented By: Shaketta Ayana Denson
Represented By: Benjamin T Boscolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald R Monje
Represented By: Sanford Alex Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.B. Express, Inc.
Represented By: Sanford Alex Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.B. Express, LLC
Represented By: Sanford Alex Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald R. Monje
Represented By: Sanford Alex Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?