Wilson v. Uber Technologies Inc.
Plaintiff: Andre Carlyle Wilson, Jr.
Defendant: Uber Technologies Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv02363
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Referring Judge: Timothy J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan Daniel Balsam on behalf of Uber Technologies Inc. (Balsam, Ethan)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Marshal as to Uber Technologies Inc. served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019.(rss, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Andre Carlyle Wilson, Jr. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 9/16/2019. (cm 9/16/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Andre Carlyle Wilson, Jr or counsel for Andre Carlyle Wilson, Jr are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 9/30/2019. (cm 9/16/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Uber Technologies Inc.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting the Plaintiff 21 days to complete and return the U.S. Marshal Service form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 8/20/2019. (cm/w/forms 8/20/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andre Carlyle Wilson, Jr(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Uber Technologies Inc., filed by Andre Carlyle Wilson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(ybs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Uber Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Carlyle Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Ethan Daniel Balsam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?