Knightsbridge Systems LLC v. DKW Communications, Inc.
Plaintiff: Knightsbridge Systems LLC
Defendant: DKW Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv02381
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Default Judgment; DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered in favor of Plaintiff in the amount of $320,482.68. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 4/2/2020. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 2, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 4/2/2020. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 16, 2020 Filing 10 Correspondence re: Request for Final Judgment Based Upon Default (Schwager, Stuart)
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to DKW Communications, Inc. by Knightsbridge Systems LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Schwager, Stuart)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to DKW Communications, Inc. (c/m 10/16/2019 bus, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to DKW Communications, Inc. (c/m 10/16/2019 bus, Deputy Clerk)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by Knightsbridge Systems LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Schwager, Stuart)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Knightsbridge Systems LLC. DKW Communications, Inc. served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019.(Schwager, Stuart)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 QC NOTICE: #3 Affidavit of Service filed by Knightsbridge Systems LLC was filed using the incorrect docketing event. **Please re-file documents by selecting Service of Process - Summons Returned Executed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on DKW Communications, Inc. upon Resident Agent CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Serivce Company on August 27, 2019, filed by Knightsbridge Systems LLC.(Schwager, Stuart) Modified on 9/12/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to DKW Communications, Inc.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Confirmation of Arbitration Award and for Judgment against Knightsbridge Systems LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8185317.), filed by Knightsbridge Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Schwager, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knightsbridge Systems LLC v. DKW Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Knightsbridge Systems LLC
Represented By: Theodore R Goldstock
Represented By: Stuart Alan Schwager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DKW Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?