ICENY USA, LLC v. M&M's, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ICENY USA LLC and ICENY USA, LLC
Defendant: Marvin Castro Mondragon, Gabriel Eugene Pico, M&M's LLC and M&M's, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv02418
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part #10 Motion for preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 10/10/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2019 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 10/10/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 3, 2019 Filing 36 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to M&M'S, LLC (Attachments: #1 First Page of Returned Document) (heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 2, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF DEFAULT (c/m to Gabriel Eugene Pico on 10/2/2019) (klss, Deputy Clerk)
October 2, 2019 Filing 34 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Gabriel Eugene Pico (c/m to Gabriel Eugene Pico on 10/2/2019) (klss, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2019 Filing 33 Motion hearing held on 10/1/2019 before Judge Theodore D. Chuang re: #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and a Preliminary Injunction.(Court Reporter: Lisa Bankins/2B) (ds2s, Deputy Clerk) . Modified text on 10/3/2019 (ds2s, Deputy Clerk).
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting #30 Motion for Leave to File an Audio File; the Order granting the five-day extension of the TRO is modified to allow for a full Fourteen (14) day extension until October 10, 2019; plaintiff is directed to complete service of process on the remaining unserved defendants as soon as posibble. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 10/1/2019. (c/m as directed on 10/1/2019 heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ICENY USA, LLC re #23 Order on Motion to Continue, (Rubinger, James)
September 30, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to File Audio File Manually by ICENY USA, LLC(Rubinger, James)
September 30, 2019 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT re #17 Order on Motion for TRO Second Declaration of Teeradej Naruenartwanich (Danny) by ICENY USA, LLC(Rubinger, James)
September 30, 2019 Filing 28 Supplemental to #17 Order on Motion for TRO filed by ICENY USA, LLC Supplemental Memorandum (Rubinger, James)
September 30, 2019 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT re #17 Order on Motion for TRO Second Declaration of Apisat Sutthisophaarporn by ICENY USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21 - Facebook cup, #2 Exhibit 22 - Facebook cup, #3 Exhibit 23 - Video with mark, #4 Exhibit 24 - Facebook sign, #5 Exhibit 25 - Facebook slogan)(Rubinger, James)
September 30, 2019 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT re #17 Order on Motion for TRO of Michael McLaughlin by ICENY USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14 - Exterior photo 9-26, #2 Exhibit 15 - Exterior photo night 9-26, #3 Exhibit 16 - Business license, #4 Exhibit 17 - Cup with logo 9 -26, #5 Exhibit 18 - Spoon with logo 9-26, #6 Exhibit 19 - Receipt 9-26, #7 Exhibit 20 - antigrill 9-26)(Rubinger, James)
September 30, 2019 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT re #17 Order on Motion for TRO on Defendant Pico by ICENY USA, LLC(Rubinger, James)
September 23, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense against Gabriel Eugene Pico by ICENY USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Request for Entry of Default)(Rubinger, James)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for a Continuance of the Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Extension of the Temporary Restraining Order, to the extent that the Court will grant a continuance until 10/1/2019 at 10:00 a.m. and extend the TRO to that date. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/17/2019. (kns, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 9/17/19)
September 16, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Extend TRO by ICENY USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubinger, James)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting Plaintiff leave to promptly file a motion requesting continuance of the Preliminary Injunction hearing currently scheduled on 9/18/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/16/2019. (kns, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 9/16/19)
September 13, 2019 Filing 20 Correspondence re: TRO (Rubinger, James)
September 12, 2019 Filing 19 TRO BOND in the amount of $ 2,000.00 posted by ICENY USA, LLC(Rubinger, James)
September 12, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Gabriel Eugene Pico on 8/28/2019, filed by ICENY USA, LLC.(Rubinger, James)
September 12, 2019 Check Received on 09/12/2019 from ICENY USA, LLA, Receipt 84637035019. Check Number: 6637. Amount: $2000.00. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #10 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and a Preliminary Injunction; A Hearing Will be Held on 9/18/19 at 9a.m.. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/6/2019. (c/m dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 5, 2019 Filing 16 Motion Hearing held on 9/5/2019 re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by ICENY USA, LLC before Judge Theodore D. Chuang. (Court Reporter: Lisa Bankins-2B) (ss5s, Deputy Clerk)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER scheduling a Hearing for September 5, 2019 at 2:00 PM re #10 Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/29/2019. (cm 08/29/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark re Deficiency Notice - AO 120, (Rubinger, James)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 Correspondence re: Pre-Motion Notice (Rubinger, James)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/23/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ICENY USA, LLC re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Johnson Pujo, Leslie)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by ICENY USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Sutthisophaarporn, #2 Affidavit Naruenartwanich, #3 Affidavit Reed, #4 Memorandum in Support, #5 Appendix Cover page and contents, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Exhibit 9, #15 Exhibit 10, #16 Exhibit 11, #17 Exhibit 12, #18 Text of Proposed Order Proposed TRO)(Johnson Pujo, Leslie)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ICENY USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Franchise Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 Notice of Default)(Johnson Pujo, Leslie)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by ICENY USA, LLC identifying Other Affiliate OKD Enterprise, llc, Other Affiliate OKD Groups, inc. for ICENY USA, LLC.(Johnson Pujo, Leslie)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of James C Rubinger. Directing attorney James C Rubinger to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/22/2019. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued 21 days as to M&M's, LLC, Marvin Castro Mondragon, Gabriel Eugene Pico.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 QC NOTICE: 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by ICENY USA, LLC was filed incorrectly. Please re-file the document by selecting Other Filings Other Documents Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement. ***Please enter corporate parent/affiliate(s) when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled.. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Deficiency Notice -- Report on Filing Patent/Trademark form (AO 120) has not been filed. The form is located at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/publications/DisplayForms.asp?ActiveTab=Civil . Please fully complete and file the form by selecting Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Report on Filing Patent/Trademark. The form must be filed by 8/29/2019 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James C. Rubinger (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8191513.) by ICENY USA LLC(Johnson Pujo, Leslie)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 Supplemental to #1 Complaint by ICENY USA LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons Pico, #2 Summons M&M's, #3 Summons Castro)(Johnson Pujo, Leslie) Modified on 8/22/2019 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk).
August 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8191466.), filed by ICENY USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Franchise Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 Notice of Default)(Johnson Pujo, Leslie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ICENY USA, LLC v. M&M's, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Castro Mondragon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Eugene Pico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&M's LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&M's, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ICENY USA LLC
Represented By: Leslie Diane Johnson Pujo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ICENY USA, LLC
Represented By: Leslie Diane Johnson Pujo
Represented By: James C Rubinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?