Jadhav v. National Institutes of Health
Plaintiff: Ajit Jadhav
Defendant: National Institutes of Health
Case Number: 8:2019cv02422
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's complaint is November 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/27/2019.(pk3s, Chambers)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by National Institutes of Health.(Marquardt, Sarah)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jennifer Anne Short. Directing attorney Jennifer Anne Short to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 9/16/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jennifer A. Short (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8231789.) by Ajit Jadhav(Fink, Sarah)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Sarah R Fink. Directing attorney Sarah R Fink to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/28/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sarah R. Fink (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8201777.) by Ajit Jadhav(Zapf, William)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ajit Jadhav. National Institutes of Health served on 8/23/2019, answer due 10/22/2019.(Zapf, William)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to National Institutes of Health.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Joseph NA R Goodwin on 8/22/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Institutes of Health ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8192888.), filed by Ajit Jadhav. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Attorney General Barr, #3 Summons US Attorney Hur, #4 Summons National Institutes of Health)(Zapf, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jadhav v. National Institutes of Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ajit Jadhav
Represented By: William Edward Zapf, III
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Short
Represented By: Sarah R Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Institutes of Health
Represented By: Sarah A Marquardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?