Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Welfare Fund et al v. MK Fire Protection & Supply LLC
Plaintiff: Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Local 669 UA Education Fund, Trustees of the Sprinkler Industry Supplemental Pension Fund, Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Pension Fund, Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Welfare Fund and Trustees of the International Training Fund
Defendant: MK Fire Protection & Supply LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv02424
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Charles B Day
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Sprinkler Industry Supplemental Pension Fund, Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Welfare Fund, Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Pension Fund, Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Local 669 UA Education Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund. MK Fire Protection & Supply LLC served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019.(Gilligan, Charles)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 8/23/2019. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day. Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Pension Fund, Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Welfare Fund, Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Local 669 UA Education Fund, Trustees of the Sprinkler Industry Supplemental Pension Fund or counsel for Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Pension Fund, Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Welfare Fund, Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Local 669 UA Education Fund, Trustees of the Sprinkler Industry Supplemental Pension Fund are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 9/6/2019. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to MK Fire Protection & Supply LLC.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Pension Fund, Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Welfare Fund, Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Local 669 UA Education Fund, Trustees of the Sprinkler Industry Supplemental Pension Fund (Gilligan, Charles)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MK Fire Protection & Supply LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8192981.), filed by Trustees of the Sprinkler Industry Supplemental Pension Fund, Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Welfare Fund, Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Pension Fund, Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Local 669 UA Education Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A)(Gilligan, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Welfare Fund et al v. MK Fire Protection & Supply LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MK Fire Protection & Supply LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Local 669 UA Education Fund
Represented By: Charles W Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Sprinkler Industry Supplemental Pension Fund
Represented By: Charles W Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Pension Fund
Represented By: Charles W Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Welfare Fund
Represented By: Charles W Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the International Training Fund
Represented By: Charles W Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?