Meltech Corporation, Inc. v. AECOM Field Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Meltech Corporation, Inc.
Defendant: URS Group, Inc., AECOM Field Services, LLC and Zurich American Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv02430
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Gina L Simms
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 21 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by AECOM Field Services, LLC (Pike, Patrick)
October 11, 2019 Filing 20 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by URS Group, Inc. (Pike, Patrick)
October 11, 2019 Filing 19 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Zurich American Insurance Company (Pike, Patrick)
October 7, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Zurich American Insurance Company.(Pike, Patrick)
October 7, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by URS Group, Inc..(Pike, Patrick)
October 7, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by AECOM Field Services, LLC, URS Group, Inc., Zurich American Insurance Company.(Pike, Patrick)
September 24, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Meltech Corporation, Inc.. URS Group, Inc. served on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019.(Sacks, Leonard)
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Meltech Corporation, Inc.. AECOM Field Services, LLC served on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019.(Sacks, Leonard)
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Meltech Corporation, Inc.. Zurich American Insurance Company served on 9/19/2019, answer due 11/18/2019.(Sacks, Leonard)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #10 Notice (Other). Meltech Corporation, Inc. must correct the following error(s):**Pursuant to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures, consent forms are to be filed with the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Filings >Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. **Incorrect form used - complete the form Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here and refile using the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE by United States Of America re 3 25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge,,,, (Sacks, Leonard) Modified on 9/9/2019 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by United States Of America (Sacks, Leonard)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued 21 days as to AECOM Field Services, LLC, URS Group, Inc., Zurich American Insurance Company.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by United States Of America re #1 Complaint Summons (3) (Sacks, Leonard)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by United States Of America re #1 Complaint Summons (2) (Sacks, Leonard)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by United States Of America re #1 Complaint Summons (Sacks, Leonard)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 8/23/2019. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. United States Of America or counsel for United States Of America are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 9/6/2019. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by United States Of America was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to #1 . (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8193708.), filed by Meltech Corporation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sacks, Leonard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meltech Corporation, Inc. v. AECOM Field Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meltech Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: Leonard Arthur Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: URS Group, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick M Pike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM Field Services, LLC
Represented By: Patrick M Pike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick M Pike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?