Bailey v. Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority et al
Plaintiff: Blake Bailey
Defendant: Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority and Amalgamated Transit Union Local 689
Case Number: 8:2019cv02540
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Charles B Day
Referring Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 9/4/2019. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day. Blake Bailey or counsel for Blake Bailey are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 9/18/2019. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Amalgamated Transit Union Local 689, Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8212324.), filed by Blake Bailey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Grant, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Bailey
Represented By: Jason A Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amalgamated Transit Union Local 689
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?