Jackson v. Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority et al
Plaintiff: Alan Jackson
Defendant: Temia Vailes and WMATA
Case Number: 8:2019cv02555
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE re #8 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority.(Phucas, Nicholas)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 Removal Notification Letter (c/m ybs, Deputy Clerk).
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 REDACTED DOCUMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, Complaint by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority(Phucas, Nicholas)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority was filed incorrectly. **In accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2 and Fed. R. Crim. P. 49.1, the parties must refrain from including or must redact the following: Names of minor children. If a minor child must be mentioned, only the initials of the child should be used. Please file a redacted version of the complaint. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 9/5/2019. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (7) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE DISTRICT COURT OF MARYLAND FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Garry Robinson, Temia Vailes, Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority, filed by Alan Jackson.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by WMATA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit, #2 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Phucas, Nicholas)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 WMATA's ANSWER to Complaint A.J., by her father and next friend, Alan Jackson, (Phucas, Nicholas) Modified on 9/5/2019 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 CROSSCLAIM against Temia Vailes, filed by WMATA.(Phucas, Nicholas)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by WMATA re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of FIling of Notice of Removal (Phucas, Nicholas)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by WMATA identifying Corporate Parent WMATA for WMATA.(Phucas, Nicholas)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Maryland for Prince George's County, case number 050265182019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8214142), filed by WMATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Previous Documents, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Phucas, Nicholas) Modified on 9/5/2019 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Temia Vailes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WMATA
Represented By: Nicholas L Phucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?