LPC Property Management, LLC v. Felton et al
Plaintiff: LPC Property Management, LLC
Defendant: Cynthia Felton and Erick Felton
Case Number: 8:2019cv02576
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by LPC Property Management, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mid-Atlantic Military Family Communities, LLC, Other Affiliate United States of America, Department of the Navy, Other Affiliate Lincoln Family Communities, LLC, Other Affiliate LMH Manager, Inc., Other Affiliate Lincoln Mid-Atlantic Asset Management LLC for LPC Property Management, LLC.(Brown, Ava)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Cynthia Felton, Erick Felton.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER the Clerk take all necessary steps to issue summons and return summons to plaintiff. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 9/30/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8249407.), filed by LPC Property Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lease, #2 Exhibit B - Ledger, #3 Exhibit C - Notice, #4 Summons Cynthia Felton, #5 Summons Erick Felton, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Attachment)(Brown, Ava)
September 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. (kns, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LPC Property Management, LLC v. Felton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LPC Property Management, LLC
Represented By: Wilton O Nedd, II
Represented By: Ava N Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Felton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erick Felton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?