Li v. Chu et al
Appellee: Fred Yen Ming Chu and Meiyu Anna Chu
Trustee: Roger Schlossberg
Appellant: Fu Quan Li
Case Number: 8:2019cv02605
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/19/2019, before Bankruptcy Judge Lori S. Simpson. Total number of pages filed: 48. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Sheet)(kns, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Fu Quan Li (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E-mail consent to motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Belcher, John)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 Supplemental Transmittal re #5 APPELLEES' DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal from U.S. Bankruptcy Court by Fred Yen Ming Chu, Meiyu Anna Chu re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Amended to Correct Case Number) (Attachments: #1 BK #83 Amended Appellees' Designation of Record)(kns, Deputy Clerk)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Notification Letter Regarding Briefs(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 APPELLEES' DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal from U.S. Bankruptcy Court by Fred Yen Ming Chu, Meiyu Anna Chu re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal; (Attachments: #1 BK #39 Proceeding Memo for Trial Hearing Held 7/24/2019, #2 BK #39-1 Plaintiff's Exhibit List, #3 BK #39-2 Defendants' Exhibit List, #4 Docket Sheet, #5 Transmittal Sheet)(kns, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 APPELLANT DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal from U.S. Bankruptcy Court by Fu Quan Li re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal Appellant Brief due by 11/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 BK #71 Statement of Issues, #2 BK #1 Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt, #3 BK #5 Answer to Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt, #4 BK #13 Defendants Request for Judicial Notice of Adjudicative Facts, #5 BK #14 Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment, #6 BK #15 Defendants Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment, #7 BK #19 Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Request for Judicial Notice of Adjudicative Facts, #8 BK #27 Proceeding MemoAdversary Proceeding, #9 BK #28 Order Denying Motion for Summary Judgment, #10 BK #29 Order Denying Defendants Request for Judicial Notice of Adjudicative Facts, #11 BK #37 Plaintiffs Motion to Reconsider Motion for Summary Judgment or for Alternative Relief, #12 BK #38 Proceeding MemoAdversary Proceeding, #13 BK #40 Memorandum Opinion on Motion to Reconsider, #14 BK #41 Order Denying Motion to Reconsider, #15 BK #63 Plaintiffs Second Notice of Appeal, #16 Docket Sheet, #17 Transmittal Sheet)(ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2019: #18 BK #1-1 Complaint, #19 BK #1-2 Exhibit A, #20 BK #1-3 Exhibit B, #21 BK #1-4 Exhibit C, #22 BK #1-5 Exhibit D, #23 BK #1-6 Exhibit E, #24 BK #1-7 Adversary Cover Sheet, #25 BK #13-1 Exhibit 1, #26 BK #13-2 Exhibit 2, #27 BK #14-1 Exhibit 1, #28 BK #14-2 Exhibit 2, #29 BK #14-3 Exhibit 3, #30 BK #14-4 Exhibit 4, #31 BK #14-5 Exhibit 5, #32 BK #14-6 Exhibit 6, #33 BK #14-7 Exhibit 7, #34 BK #14-8 Exhibit 8, #35 BK #14-9 Exhibit 9, #36 BK #14-10 Exhibit 10, #37 BK #14-11 Exhibit 11, #38 BK #14-12 Exhibit 12, #39 BK #14-13 Exhibit 13, #40 BK #14-14 Exhibit 14, #41 BK #14-15 Exhibit 15, #42 BK #14-16 Exhibit 16, #43 BK #14-17 Proposed Order, #44 BK #15-1 Circuit Court Case Complaint, #45 BK #15-2 Answer, #46 BK #15-3 Circuit Court Case Docket, #47 BK #15-4 Order of Default, #48 BK #15-5 Court Hearing Transcript 11-5-2010, #49 BK #15-6 Motion to Vacate Order of Default, #50 BK #15-7 Court Hearing Transcript 1-3-2011, #51 BK #15-8 Judgment and Order 1-4-2011, #52 BK #19-1 Proposed Order) (kns, Deputy Clerk).
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/11/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. (Greenbelt). Bankruptcy Court case number 18-20703,, filed by Fu Quan Li. (Attachments: #1 Order Being Appealed, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Transmittal Sheet)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Li v. Chu et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fred Yen Ming Chu
Represented By: Junwei Wayne Hou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Meiyu Anna Chu
Represented By: Junwei Wayne Hou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Roger Schlossberg
Represented By: Roger Schlossberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Fu Quan Li
Represented By: John Christopher Belcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?