Patuxent Roofing and Contracting, Inc v. Edifice Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America for the use of Patuxent Roofing and Contracting, Inc. and Patuxent Roofing and Contracting, Inc.
Defendant: The Guarantee Company of North America USA and Edifice Group, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv02617
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Charles B Day
Referring Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1352
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part the consent request to stay this case pending arbitration proceedings #13 . The Court finds it more appropriate to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case until the conclusion of arbitration proceedings subject to being reopened on the request of counsel within 30 days of the conclusion of proceedings. The parties are directed to file a status report every 180 days until the conclusion of arbitration proceedings. The Clerk is directed to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/17/2019. (imws, Chambers)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for the Defendants to file their responsive pleadings to the Plaintiff's Complaint in this case is extended to and including November 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/11/2019. (imws, Chambers)
October 10, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Edifice Group, Inc., The Guarantee Company of North America USA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubino, David)
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 Correspondence re: Letter of intent to file Motion to Stay (Rubino, David)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David L Rubino on behalf of All Defendants (Rubino, David)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER ORDER REGARDING THE FILING OF MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/25/2019. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patuxent Roofing and Contracting, Inc.. The Guarantee Company of North America USA served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Zisa, Michael)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patuxent Roofing and Contracting, Inc.. Edifice Group, Inc. served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Zisa, Michael)
September 24, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Leigh Harris on behalf of Patuxent Roofing and Contracting, Inc. (Harris, Jennifer)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 9/10/2019. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day. Patuxent Roofing and Contracting, Inc. or counsel for Patuxent Roofing and Contracting, Inc. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 9/24/2019. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Edifice Group, Inc., The Guarantee Company of North America USA.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Patuxent Roofing and Contracting, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Not all attorneys listed as counsel have signed the document. Court staff has entered the appearance of only the attorneys who have signed the document. All other attorneys must enter their own entries of appearance. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by United States of America for the use of Patuxent Roofing and Contracting, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Patuxent Roofing and Contracting, Inc. for United States of America for the use of Patuxent Roofing and Contracting, Inc..(Zisa, Michael)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America for the use of Patuxent Roofing and Contracting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons re Edifice, #3 Summons re Guarantee)(Zisa, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patuxent Roofing and Contracting, Inc v. Edifice Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Guarantee Company of North America USA
Represented By: David L Rubino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edifice Group, Inc.
Represented By: David L Rubino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America for the use of Patuxent Roofing and Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Leigh Harris
Represented By: Michael C Zisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patuxent Roofing and Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: Michael C Zisa
Represented By: Jennifer Leigh Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?