Evans v. Maryland-National Capital Park & Planning Commission et al
Plaintiff: Codi Evans
Defendant: Michael Murphy, Maryland-National Capital Park & Planning Commission, Michael Riley, Darryl Mcswain, Darin Uhrig, Maryland National Capital Parks & Planning Commission, Chief Darryl McSwain, Captain Darin Uhrig and Captain Michael Murphy
Case Number: 8:2019cv02651
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 PAPERLESS NOTICE. A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE is scheduled for November 19, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. to discuss #5 NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE A MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT; #7 NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE A MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND/OR A MOTION TO DISMISS; and #10 NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE A MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND/OR A MOTION TO DISMISS. To join the call at the scheduled time: (1) Dial 1-888-557-8511. (2) Enter access code 3008173, followed by the # key. You will then be placed on hold until Chambers dials into the call, at which point you will be prompted to enter a security code. (3) When prompted, enter security code 11190330 followed by the # key. The call will be recorded, so please do not use speakerphones as they compromise sound quality. Also, we ask that parties not remain on the conference line after the Judge has left the call, to ensure that the line is free for other calls that may be on the Judge's calendar. The parties should also be prepared to address whether they consent to have all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge and whether they wish to participate in a mediation session with a Magistrate Judge, whether before, during, or after discovery. Parties are expected to consult with their clients and confer with each other on these issues in advance of the Case Management Conference and, if possible, present joint views to the Court. (sb3s, Chambers)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Darin Uhrig of Intent to File a Motion (Bruce, Marie)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Marie Celeste Bruce on behalf of Darin Uhrig (Bruce, Marie)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by William Charles Dickerson on behalf of Maryland National Capital Parks & Planning Commission, Darryl McSwain, Michael Riley (Dickerson, William)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Conference (Creed, Joseph)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M Creed on behalf of Michael Murphy (Creed, Joseph)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Maryland National Capital Parks & Planning Commission, Darryl McSwain, Michael Riley (Dickerson, William)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/13/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Maryland National Capital Parks & Planning Commission, Darryl McSwain, Michael Murphy, Michael Riley, Darin Uhrig.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Codi Evans (Hansel, Cary)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8228215.), filed by Codi Evans. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Summons MNCPPC Summons, #3 Summons McSwain Summons, #4 Summons Murphy Summons, #5 Summons Riley Summons, #6 Summons Uhrig Summons)(Hansel, Cary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Maryland-National Capital Park & Planning Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland-National Capital Park & Planning Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Riley
Represented By: William Charles Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Mcswain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darin Uhrig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland National Capital Parks & Planning Commission
Represented By: William Charles Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Darryl McSwain
Represented By: William Charles Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Darin Uhrig
Represented By: Marie Celeste Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Michael Murphy
Represented By: Joseph M Creed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Codi Evans
Represented By: Cary Johnson Hansel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?