Brooks et al v. Sporn et al
Plaintiff: Dorcas Dlodlo Chifamba, Mr. Charles Brooks and Miranda Chifamba
Defendant: The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack and Jay Sporn
Case Number: 8:2019cv02674
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #16 Counterclaim by Charles Brooks.(Ziccardi, Michael)
October 7, 2019 Filing 17 Correspondence from Jared Silverzahn regarding Standing Order Concerning Removal. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 7, 2019 Filing 16 COUNTERCLAIM against Charles Brooks, filed by The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack.(Kahn, Joshua)
September 23, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE re #11 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Jay Sporn, The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack.(Kahn, Joshua)
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack identifying Corporate Parent Icahn Automotive Group LLC, Other Affiliate Icahn Enterprise L.P. for The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack.(Kahn, Joshua)
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack State Court Documents (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons directed to Pep Boys, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Plaintiffs civil case information report, #3 Plaintiffs' complaint, #4 Pep Boys' answer, #5 C. Brooks interrogatories to Pep Boys, #6 Plaintiffs requests for documents to Pep Boys)(Kahn, Joshua)
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 Removal Notification Letter (c/m ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 9/23/2019. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 QC NOTICE: #7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file the document by selecting Other Filings Other Documents Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement. ***Please enter corporate parent/affiliate(s) when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 QC NOTICE: #6 Redacted Document filed by The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack was filed incorrectly. **Each state court document (i.e., complaint, summons, etc.) must be properly labeled and filed as separate attachments. Please refile each attachment using the "Other Documents" category, select the "Supplemental" event, and link filing to 1 Notice of Removal. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (8) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against Jay Sporn, The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack, filed by Charles Brooks, Dorcas Dlodlo Chifamba, Miranda Chifamba.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack (Kahn, Joshua) Modified on 9/23/2019 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
September 16, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Paula Xinis. Judge Catherine C. Blake no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 REDACTED DOCUMENT to #4 Redacted Document Exhibit A by The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack(Kahn, Joshua)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 Supplemental to #4 Redacted Document filed by The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack (Kahn, Joshua)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 REDACTED DOCUMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Kahn, Joshua)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack was filed incorrectly. Please correct the following errors: **(1) In accordance with FRCP 5.2 parties must redact names of minor children. Please file a REDACTED Notice of Removal using the event "REDACTED DOCUMENT" found in "Other Documents" in CM/ECF. Please file all REDACTED attachments to the removal as SEPARATE DOCKET ENTRIES using events that correspond with the document title. (2) Civil cover sheet was not filed - Please make as an attachment to the Redacted Notice of Removal. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack re #1 Notice of Removal, Line (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Kahn, Joshua) Modified on 9/13/2019 (slss, Deputy Clerk).
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 UNREDACTED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, case number CAL19-22865. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8229580), filed by The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack. (Attachments: #1 UNREDACTED Exhibit A, #2 Certification)(Kahn, Joshua) Modified on 9/13/2019 (dass, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks et al v. Sporn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorcas Dlodlo Chifamba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Charles Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miranda Chifamba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack
Represented By: Joshua Franklin Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Sporn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?