Bey v. Jupiter's LLC et al
Plaintiff: Marissa Jaha Bey
Defendant: B4U Solutions LLC, Jupiter's LLC, Cherri Simpkins Gardener and Pardo & Drazin PLLC (or LLC)
Case Number: 8:2019cv02705
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331fr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RETURNED PLEADING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 9/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 First Page of Returned Document)(c/m ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; dismissing #1 Complaint; directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 9/20/2019. (cm 9/20/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marissa Jaha Bey(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against B4U Solutions LLC, Jupiter's LLC, Pardo & Drazin PLLC (or LLC), Cherri Simpkins Gardener, filed by Marissa Jaha Bey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bey v. Jupiter's LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B4U Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jupiter's LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherri Simpkins Gardener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pardo & Drazin PLLC (or LLC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marissa Jaha Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?