Mathis v. Shah
Plaintiff: Mitchell Mathis
Defendant: Rizwan Shah
Case Number: 8:2019cv02753
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Charles B Day
Referring Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #5 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 10/11/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 11, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rizwan Shah. Rizwan Shah waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019.(Monica, John)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John Cosmos Monica, Jr on behalf of Rizwan Shah (Monica, John)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing Mitchell Mathis or Counsel for Mitchell Mathis to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2018-04. Show Cause Hearing set for 11/29/2019 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Mitchell Mathis or Counsel for Mitchell Mathis files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 10/3/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2019 CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 0416-8239731(Temple, Donald)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 9/18/2019. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day. Mitchell Mathis or counsel for Mitchell Mathis are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 10/2/2019. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Rizwan Shah.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RIZWAN SHAH, (Filing fee $400 Receipt No. 0416-8239731) filed by MITCHELL MATHIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1&2, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 3-5, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover Sheet, #4 Summons Summons)(Temple, Donald) Modified on 9/18/2019 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathis v. Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rizwan Shah
Represented By: John Cosmos Monica, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Mathis
Represented By: Donald Melvin Temple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?