DeMisse v. Montgomery County Police Officers
Plaintiff: Samuel T. DeMisse
Defendant: Montgomery County Police Officers
Case Number: 8:2019cv02891
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER dismissing without prejudice #1 Complaint; directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 11/26/2019. (cm to USDC for the District of Columbia 11/27/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting the Plaintiff 21 days to provide an address; directing the Clerk to forward this Order to the USDC for the District of Columbia. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 10/7/2019. (cs as directed 10/8/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-02215. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the District of Maryland. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 9/24/2019.. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/03/2019. (zad)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by SAMUEL T. DEMISSE (zrdj)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; and it is further ORDERED that, within 30 days from the filing date of this order, plaintiff shall file a notice. See attached order for full details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/9/2019. (zjd)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by SAMUEL T. DEMISSE (zsb)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MONTGOMERY COUNTY POLICE OFFICERS filed by SAMUEL T. DEMISSE. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(zsb)
July 25, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 07/25/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeMisse v. Montgomery County Police Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County Police Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel T. DeMisse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?