Janey v. Saul
Plaintiff: Denise Janey
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 8:2019cv02894
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued 60 days as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 10/8/2019. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson for All Proceedings. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/4/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Appearance by Vickie LeDuc and Consent to Magistrate Judge on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Denise Janey(Shea, Stephen)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Shea, Stephen)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Denise Janey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Shea, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Janey v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Janey
Represented By: Stephen F Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?