Emrit v. National Football League et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Defendant: Washington Redskins, Daniel Snyder and National Football League
Case Number: 8:2019cv02968
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RETURN PLEADING ORDER. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 11/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 First Page of Returned Document)(c/m 11/8/19 - dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; dismissing as frivolous #1 Complaint; directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 10/17/2019. (cm 10/18/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronald Satish Emrit(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Football League, Daniel Snyder, Washington Redskins, filed by Ronald Satish Emrit. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emrit v. National Football League et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Redskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Football League
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?