Garey v. BWW Law Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: Monica Garey
Defendant: BWW Law Group LLC, SunTrust Mortgage Inc. and SunTrust Bank
Case Number: 8:2019cv03112
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Referring Judge: Gina L Simms
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2019 Filing 20 STATUS REPORT by Monica Garey(Styles, Jeffrey)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER memorializing yesterday's telephone conference. Defendant BWW Law Group will file its motion to dismiss by January 13, 2020. Plaintiff will file its response by February 3, 2020. BWW Law Group will file its reply by February 17, 2020. The brief in support of the motion to dismiss and response will be limited to 25 pages or less, and the reply will be limited to 15 pages or less, unless the parties request and the Court grants additional pages. If Plaintiff would like to amend the Complaint prior to the motion to dismiss briefing, Plaintiff will notify the Court by December 23, 2019. In that event, the parties will confer and jointly propose a schedule for filing the amended complaint and the motion to dismiss briefing. In the meantime, discovery will continue for all parties in accordance with the Scheduling Order and Discovery Order, ECF Nos. 15 and 16. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/19/2019. (pk3s, Chambers)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion to Continue Rule 16 Conference. The Rule 16 conference is RESCHEDULED TO December 18, 2019 at 2:30PM. Plaintiff's counsel is DIRECTED to initiate the call to chambers or circulate a conference call number to the parties. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/9/2019. (ats, Chambers)
December 6, 2019 Filing 17 Consent MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Conference Call by Monica Garey(Styles, Jeffrey)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Initial Discovery Protocols)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 5/5/2020. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/26/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 telephone conference call on December 12, 2019 at 2:00pm AND DIRECTING Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call to chambers or circulate a conference call number to the parties. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/26/2019. (ats, Chambers)
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by SunTrust Bank identifying Corporate Parent SunTrust Banks, Inc. for SunTrust Bank.(Egeli, Matthew)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by SunTrust Mortgage, Inc. and by SunTrust Bank.(Egeli, Matthew)
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Alfred Egeli on behalf of SunTrust Mortgage Inc. (Egeli, Matthew)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Alfred Egeli on behalf of SunTrust Bank (Egeli, Matthew)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER directing Plaintiff to inform the Court whether all Defendants have been served, and, if so, to notify the Court of the contact information for counsel for Defendants Sun Trust Mortgage Inc. and Sun Trust Bank, if known. The Court will then schedule a telephone conference with all parties that have been served to discuss briefing on potential motions to dismiss, in light of Defendant BWW Law Group LLC's request, ECF No. 8. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/22/2019. (pk3s, Chambers).
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by BWW Law Group LLC Notice of Intent to File a Motion (Cohen, Matthew)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/13/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 10/28/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Monica Garey or counsel for Monica Garey are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 11/12/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to BWW Law Group LLC, SunTrust Bank and SunTrust Mortgage Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8313577.), filed by Monica Garey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons for BWW Law Group, LLC, #3 Summons Summons for SunTrust Mortgage, #4 Summons Summons for SunTrust Bank)(Styles, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garey v. BWW Law Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BWW Law Group LLC
Represented By: Matthew D Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Mortgage Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Alfred Egeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Bank
Represented By: Matthew Alfred Egeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Garey
Represented By: Jeffrey W Styles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?