Merideth v. Prince George's County et al
Plaintiff: Lionel Merideth
Defendant: Prince George's County, John Doe Officer 2, JOHN DOE OFFICER 1, John Doe Officer 3, Officer John Doe #3, Officer John Doe #2 and Officer Thompson
Case Number: 8:2019cv03198
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Prince George's County(Coderre, Carol)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Rule 16 conference call set for December 30, 2019 has been RESCHEDULED to January 15, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. Plaintiff should initiate call to Chambers at (301) 344-0653. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 12/26/2019. (tb2s, Chambers)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Discovery Motions. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 12/11/2019. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 4/24/2020. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 12/11/2019. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by Prince George's County.(Coderre, Carol)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Prince George's County (Coderre, Carol)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Prince George's County was filed incorrectly. **Please re-file the document by selecting Other Filings -> Other Documents -> Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement. ***Must be filed separately. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 6, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3-4) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY, MARYLAND. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Doe #2, John Doe #3, Prince George's County, Thompson, filed by Lionel Merideth.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against John Doe #2, John Doe #3, Prince George's County, Thompson, filed by Lionel Merideth.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal,,,, filed by Prince George's County Corrected Notice of Removal (Coderre, Carol)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL 8:19-cv-3198 from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, Maryland, case number CAL19-06124. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8330866), filed by Prince George's County. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Disclosure Corporate Interest, #3 Attachment State Court Civil Case Summary, #4 Attachment State Court Civil Case Closure Form, #5 Attachment State Court Notice of Filing Removal, #6 Attachment State Court Affidavit of Service, #7 Attachment State Court Notification of Contemplated Dismissal, #8 Attachment State Court Writ of Summons, #9 Attachment State Court Amended Complaint, #10 Attachment State Court Amended Complaint Redline, #11 Attachment State Court Clerk Communication with Plaintiff Counsel, #12 Attachment State Court Clerk Communication with Plaintiff Counsel, #13 Attachment State Court Writ of Summons 5/31/19, #14 Attachment State Court Praecipe to Re-issue Summons, #15 Attachment State Court Civil Case Info Rpt, #16 Attachment State Court Complaint, #17 Attachment State Court Clerk Certification of State Court File)(Coderre, Carol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merideth v. Prince George's County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prince George's County
Represented By: Carol Ann Coderre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Officer 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE OFFICER 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Officer 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer John Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lionel Merideth
Represented By: Malik Shabazz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?