Clark/US-Back River, LLC v. Zurich American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Clark/US-Back River, LLC
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv03356
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 15 Acknowledgment Receipt from Circuit Court for Montgomery County. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
January 27, 2020 Filing 14 REMAND Correspondence from Clerk to Circuit Court for Montgomery County Maryland. (c/m 1/29/2020 heps, Deputy Clerk)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Withdraw Notice of Removal; Case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court for Montgomery County. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 1/27/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
January 27, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Clark/US-Back River, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jaffe, Michael)
January 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Clark/US-Back River, LLC re #9 MOTION to Withdraw #1 Notice of Removal, and Remand (Jaffe, Michael)
January 6, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #7 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Clark/US-Back River, LLC by Zurich American Insurance Company.(Lysaught, Judith)
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw #1 Notice of Removal, and Remand by Zurich American Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lysaught, Judith)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order Concerning Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 11/27/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 26, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (7-7) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR MONTGOMERY COUNTY. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Zurich American Insurance Company, filed by Clark/US-Back River, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Case Information Report, #2 Summons)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 11/26/2019. (jw2s, Chambers)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Zurich American Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lysaught, Judith)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Zurich American Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Attachment Affidavit of Service)(Lysaught, Judith)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Zurich American Insurance Company was filed incorrectly. Each attachment must be specifically labeled (i.e. complaint, summons, etc). Please refile each attachment using the "Other Documents" category, select the "Supplemental" event, and link filing to #1 Notice of Removal. The first labeled attachment can be the main document and the other labeled documents as separate attachments. File any pending motions as separate docket entries. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Zurich American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company Ltd, Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd. for Zurich American Insurance Company.(Lysaught, Judith)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Montgomery County, case number 473359-V. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8365363), filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lysaught, Judith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark/US-Back River, LLC v. Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Judith Gayle Lysaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clark/US-Back River, LLC
Represented By: Michael Evan Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?