Harper v. 2U, Inc. et al
Petitioner: Employees' Retirement System of the Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority, DeKalb County Pension Fund, Herbert Saunders, Public School Teachers Pension & Retirement Fund of Chicago, Erik Fjellborg, Edward Hackman, Aaron Harper, National Elevator Industry Pension Fund, Anders-Christian Moeller and Fiyyaz Pirani
Respondent: Catherine A. Graham, 2U, Inc. and Christopher J. Paucek
Case Number: 8:2019cv03455
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:0078j
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 65 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-07390. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 26, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of Maryland. (jca)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #45 Motion to Transfer Case; terminating #48 Letter Motion for Oral Argument. On October 16, 2019, Defendants filed a motion to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Maryland pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). On November 25, 2019, Proposed Lead Plaintiffs Chicago Teachers and Pirani both filed notices of non-opposition to Defendants' motion to transfer. Defendants' unopposed motion to transfer is granted. The conference to consider motions for appointment of lead plaintiff and lead counsel and for consolidation is hereby adjourned sine die. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions at Dkt. 45 and 48 and transfer the consolidated case to the District of Maryland. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/26/2019) (jca) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
November 25, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of FIYYAZ PIRANI'S NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER re: #59 Order,,. Document filed by Fiyyaz Pirani. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
November 25, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Public School Teachers' Pension & Retirement Fund of Chicago's Non-Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer re: #45 MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of Maryland pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a).. Document filed by Public School Teachers Pension & Retirement Fund of Chicago. (McConville, Francis)
November 22, 2019 Filing 61 DECLARATION of Jeremy A. Lieberman in Support re: #39 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 19-cv-07479 . MOTION to Appoint Fiyyaz Pirani to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel .. Document filed by Fiyyaz Pirani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pirani Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Certification)(Lieberman, Jeremy)
November 22, 2019 Filing 60 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #39 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 19-cv-07479 . MOTION to Appoint Fiyyaz Pirani to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel . . Document filed by Fiyyaz Pirani. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER: A conference to consider motions for appointment of lead plaintiff and lead counsel and for consolidation is presently scheduled for December 6, 2019. On October 16, 2019, Defendants filed a motion to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Maryland and requested oral argument. No Plaintiff has filed a response to Defendants' motion to transfer. By November 25, 2019, Plaintiff's Chicago Teachers and Pirani shall inform the Court as to whether they oppose Defendants' motion to transfer, and if so, propose a date for their response. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/19/2019) (ama)
November 15, 2019 Filing 58 DECLARATION of Francis P. McConville in Support re: #21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-07390-RA; 1:19-cv-07479-RA . MOTION to Appoint Public School Teachers Pension & Retirement Fund of Chicago to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by Public School Teachers Pension & Retirement Fund of Chicago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lion Biotechnologies Order, #2 Exhibit B - Snap Litigation Order)(McConville, Francis)
November 15, 2019 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-07390-RA; 1:19-cv-07479-RA . MOTION to Appoint Public School Teachers Pension & Retirement Fund of Chicago to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Public School Teachers Pension & Retirement Fund of Chicago. (McConville, Francis)
October 22, 2019 Filing 56 RESPONSE to Motion re: #39 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 19-cv-07479 . MOTION to Appoint Fiyyaz Pirani to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel . Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motion of Fiyyaz Pirani for Consolidation of Related Actions, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel; and In Opposition to Competing Motions. Document filed by Fiyyaz Pirani. (Hood, Joseph)
October 21, 2019 Filing 55 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU (SEE #56 Response) - REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #39 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 19-cv-07479 . MOTION to Appoint Fiyyaz Pirani to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel . and in Opposition to Competing Motions. Document filed by Fiyyaz Pirani. (Hood, Joseph) Modified on 10/23/2019 (db).
October 21, 2019 Filing 54 RESPONSE to Motion re: #27 MOTION to Appoint Employees' Retirement System of the Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and Approval of Selection of Counsel., #21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-07390-RA; 1:19-cv-07479-RA . MOTION to Appoint Public School Teachers Pension & Retirement Fund of Chicago to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., #11 MOTION to Appoint Erik Fjellborg to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and Approval of His Selection of Lead Counsel., #35 MOTION to Appoint 2U Investor Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and Approval of Selection of Counsel., #13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Aaron Harper to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., #17 MOTION to Appoint Anders-Christian Moeller to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-07479 ., #24 MOTION to Appoint DeKalb County Pension Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., #39 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 19-cv-07479 . MOTION to Appoint Fiyyaz Pirani to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel . . Document filed by National Elevator Industry Pension Fund. (Rosenfeld, David)
October 21, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Non-Opposition. Document filed by Aaron Harper. (Portnoy, Lesley)
October 18, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of DeKalb County Pension Fund's Non-Opposition to Competing Lead Plaintiff Motions. Document filed by DeKalb County Pension Fund. (Wilson, James)
October 18, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Non-Opposition to the Competing Motions for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff. Document filed by Employees' Retirement System of the Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority. (Twersky, Mitchell)
October 18, 2019 Filing 50 RESPONSE to Motion re: #35 MOTION to Appoint 2U Investor Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and Approval of Selection of Counsel. NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION OF THE 2U INVESTOR GROUP FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF COUNSEL. Document filed by Edward Hackman, Herbert Saunders. (Holleman, William)
October 18, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Competing Motions for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff. Document filed by Erik Fjellborg. (Campisi, Jeffrey)
October 16, 2019 Filing 48 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from J. Christian Word dated October 16, 2019. Document filed by 2U, Inc., Catherine A. Graham, Christopher J. Paucek.(Word, J.)
October 16, 2019 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Matthew Norden in Support re: #45 MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of Maryland pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a).. Document filed by 2U, Inc., Catherine A. Graham, Christopher J. Paucek. (Word, J.)
October 16, 2019 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #45 MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of Maryland pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). . Document filed by 2U, Inc., Catherine A. Graham, Christopher J. Paucek. (Word, J.)
October 16, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of Maryland pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Document filed by 2U, Inc., Catherine A. Graham, Christopher J. Paucek.(Word, J.)
October 15, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Motions to Appoint Lead Plaintiff. Document filed by Anders-Christian Moeller. (Nicholson, Melinda)
October 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #18 Proposed Order, #40 Proposed Order, #30 Proposed Order, #36 Proposed Order, #29 Proposed Order, #22 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (ad)
October 7, 2019 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Jeremy A. Lieberman in Support re: #39 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 19-cv-07479 . MOTION to Appoint Fiyyaz Pirani to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel .. Document filed by Fiyyaz Pirani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Loss Chart, #2 Exhibit B - Press Release, #3 Exhibit C - Certification, #4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume)(Lieberman, Jeremy)
October 7, 2019 Filing 42 DECLARATION of William S. Holleman in Support re: #35 MOTION to Appoint 2U Investor Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and Approval of Selection of Counsel.. Document filed by Edward Hackman, Herbert Saunders. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certifications, #2 Exhibit B Loss Charts, #3 Exhibit C Joint Declaration, #4 Exhibit D Original Press Release, #5 Exhibit E Firm Resume)(Holleman, William)
October 7, 2019 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #39 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 19-cv-07479 . MOTION to Appoint Fiyyaz Pirani to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Approve Counsel . . Document filed by Fiyyaz Pirani. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
October 7, 2019 Filing 40 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Fiyyaz Pirani. Related Document Number: #39 . (Lieberman, Jeremy) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
October 7, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 19-cv-07479 ., MOTION to Appoint Fiyyaz Pirani to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Approve Counsel . Document filed by Fiyyaz Pirani.(Lieberman, Jeremy)
October 7, 2019 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #35 MOTION to Appoint 2U Investor Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and Approval of Selection of Counsel. . Document filed by Edward Hackman, Herbert Saunders. (Holleman, William)
October 7, 2019 Filing 37 DECLARATION of Mitchell M.Z. Twersky in Support re: #27 MOTION to Appoint Employees' Retirement System of the Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and Approval of Selection of Counsel.. Document filed by Employees' Retirement System of the Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1 - Notice, #2 Exhibit #2 - PSLRA Certification, #3 Exhibit #3 - Firm Resume)(Twersky, Mitchell)
October 7, 2019 Filing 36 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by National Elevator Industry Pension Fund. Related Document Number: #31 . (Rosenfeld, David) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
October 7, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Appoint 2U Investor Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and Approval of Selection of Counsel. Document filed by Edward Hackman, Herbert Saunders. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holleman, William)
October 7, 2019 Filing 34 DECLARATION of David A. Rosenfeld in Support re: #31 MOTION to Appoint National Elevator Industry Pension Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by National Elevator Industry Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Estimate of losses)(Rosenfeld, David)
October 7, 2019 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #27 MOTION to Appoint Employees' Retirement System of the Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and Approval of Selection of Counsel. . Document filed by Employees' Retirement System of the Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority. (Twersky, Mitchell)
October 7, 2019 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #31 MOTION to Appoint National Elevator Industry Pension Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by National Elevator Industry Pension Fund. (Rosenfeld, David)
October 7, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Appoint National Elevator Industry Pension Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by National Elevator Industry Pension Fund.(Rosenfeld, David)
October 7, 2019 Filing 30 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Employees' Retirement System of the Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority. Related Document Number: [ECF No. 27]. (Twersky, Mitchell) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
October 7, 2019 Filing 29 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by DeKalb County Pension Fund. Related Document Number: #24 . (Wilson, James) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
October 7, 2019 Filing 28 DECLARATION of James M. Wilson, Jr. in Support re: #24 MOTION to Appoint DeKalb County Pension Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by DeKalb County Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Notice of Pendency of a Class Action, #2 Exhibit B - PSLRA Certification of DeKalb County Pension Fund, #3 Exhibit C - Chart of DeKalb County Pension Fund's Losses, #4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume of Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP)(Wilson, James)
October 7, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Appoint Employees' Retirement System of the Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and Approval of Selection of Counsel. Document filed by Employees' Retirement System of the Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority.(Twersky, Mitchell)
October 7, 2019 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Francis P. McConville in Support re: #21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-07390-RA; 1:19-cv-07479-RA . MOTION to Appoint Public School Teachers Pension & Retirement Fund of Chicago to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by Public School Teachers Pension & Retirement Fund of Chicago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certifications, #2 Exhibit B - Loss Analysis, #3 Exhibit C - Notice, #4 Exhibit D - Labaton Sucharow Firm Resume)(McConville, Francis)
October 7, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #24 MOTION to Appoint DeKalb County Pension Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by DeKalb County Pension Fund. (Wilson, James)
October 7, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Appoint DeKalb County Pension Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by DeKalb County Pension Fund.(Wilson, James)
October 7, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-07390-RA; 1:19-cv-07479-RA . MOTION to Appoint Public School Teachers Pension & Retirement Fund of Chicago to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Public School Teachers Pension & Retirement Fund of Chicago. (McConville, Francis)
October 7, 2019 Filing 22 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Public School Teachers Pension & Retirement Fund of Chicago. Related Document Number: #21 . (McConville, Francis) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
October 7, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-07390-RA; 1:19-cv-07479-RA ., MOTION to Appoint Public School Teachers Pension & Retirement Fund of Chicago to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by Public School Teachers Pension & Retirement Fund of Chicago.(McConville, Francis)
October 7, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Melinda A. Nicholson in Support re: #17 MOTION to Appoint Anders-Christian Moeller to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-07479 .. Document filed by Anders-Christian Moeller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Loss Chart, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Notice, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Firm Resume)(Nicholson, Melinda)
October 7, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #17 MOTION to Appoint Anders-Christian Moeller to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-07479 . . Document filed by Anders-Christian Moeller. (Nicholson, Melinda)
October 7, 2019 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Anders-Christian Moeller. Related Document Number: [1:19-cv-07479]. (Nicholson, Melinda) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
October 7, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Appoint Anders-Christian Moeller to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:19-cv-07479 . Document filed by Anders-Christian Moeller.(Nicholson, Melinda)
October 7, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Lesley F. Portnoy in Support re: #13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Aaron Harper to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Aaron Harper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Press Release, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume)(Portnoy, Lesley)
October 7, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Aaron Harper to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . . Document filed by Aaron Harper. (Portnoy, Lesley)
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Jeffrey P. Campisi in Support re: #11 MOTION to Appoint Erik Fjellborg to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and Approval of His Selection of Lead Counsel.. Document filed by Erik Fjellborg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Campisi, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., MOTION to Appoint Aaron Harper to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by Aaron Harper. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Portnoy, Lesley)
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #11 MOTION to Appoint Erik Fjellborg to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and Approval of His Selection of Lead Counsel. . Document filed by Erik Fjellborg. (Campisi, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Erik Fjellborg to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and Approval of His Selection of Lead Counsel. Document filed by Erik Fjellborg.(Campisi, Jeffrey)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JOINT STIPULATION: Motions terminated: (10 in 1:19-cv-07479-RA) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: (1) Complaint and submitting joint stipulation addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from J. Christian Word dated August 26, 2019. filed by 2U, Inc., Catherine A. Graham, Christopher J. Paucek, (9 in 1:19-cv-07390-RA) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: (1) Complaint and submitting joint stipulation addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from J. Christian Word dated August 26, 2019. filed by 2U, Inc., Catherine A. Graham, Christopher J. Paucek. WHEREFORE, the parties, by and through their undersigned counsel, hereby stipulate that the Court be requested to enter an order as follows: 1. Defendants, including all defendants both named and unnamed (hereinafter collectively referred to as "Defendants"), need not answer, move against or otherwise respond to this or any related action until a consolidated complaint is filed; 2. The presently filed action and any subsequently filed, related actions shall be consolidated for hearing before the Honorable Judge Ronnie Abrams and shall hereinafter be captioned In Re 2u, Inc., Securities Class Action; 3. Lead plaintiff shall serve a consolidated complaint ("Consolidated Complaint") within 60 days of entry of the Court's Order appointing lead plaintiff and designating lead counsel; 4. Defendants shall answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the Consolidated Complaint 60 days after service of the Consolidated Complaint; 5. If Defendants move to dismiss the Consolidated Complaint, the lead plaintiff shall serve an opposition memorandum within 60 days of service of Defendants' motion to dismiss, and Defendants shall serve any reply memoranda within 30 days after service of the lead plaintiff's opposition memorandum; and 6. By entering into this stipulation, the parties expressly preserve, and do not waive, any and all claims, arguments, and defenses (other than improper service). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/27/2019) (ks)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint and submitting joint stipulation addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from J. Christian Word dated August 26, 2019. Document filed by 2U, Inc., Catherine A. Graham, Christopher J. Paucek. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation & Proposed Order)(Word, J.)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for J. Christian Word to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (arc)
August 23, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for J. Christian Word to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 2U, Inc..(Word, J.)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for J. Christian Word to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by 2U, Inc., Catherine A. Graham, Christopher J. Paucek. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of J. Christian Word in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Word, J.)
August 12, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 11/16/2019 (ks)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/6/2019 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/12/2019) (ks)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 2U, Inc., Catherine A. Graham, Christopher J. Paucek. (sj)
August 8, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
August 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
August 8, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
August 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lesley Frank Portnoy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Aaron Harper. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (sj)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 2U, INC., CHRISTOPHER J. PAUCEK, and CATHERINE A. GRAHAM, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Aaron Harper. (Portnoy, Lesley)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Portnoy, Lesley)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 2U, Inc., Catherine A. Graham, Christopher J. Paucek. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17391415)Document filed by Aaron Harper.(Portnoy, Lesley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harper v. 2U, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Employees' Retirement System of the Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DeKalb County Pension Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Herbert Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Public School Teachers Pension & Retirement Fund of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Erik Fjellborg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edward Hackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Aaron Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Elevator Industry Pension Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anders-Christian Moeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fiyyaz Pirani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Catherine A. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: 2U, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christopher J. Paucek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?