Gonzalez v. New York Mart MD, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ana D. Gonzalez
Defendant: John Doe, (2), Long Deng, John Doe, (1) and New York Mart MD, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv00020
Filed: January 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER cancelling Rule 16 Case Management Conference; directing parties to file written consent to transfer of case to a U.S. Magistrate Judge within seven days. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 2/26/2020. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
February 18, 2020 Filing 12 PAPERLESS NOTICE. The RULE 16 CONFERENCE is RESCHEDULED for February 26, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. To join the call at the scheduled time: (1) Dial 1-888-557-8511. (2) Enter access code 3008173, followed by the # key. You will then be placed on hold until Chambers dials into the call, at which point you will be prompted to enter a security code. (3) When prompted, enter security code 02261130 followed by the # key. The call will be recorded, so please do not use speakerphones as they compromise sound quality. Also, we ask that parties not remain on the conference line after the Judge has left the call, to ensure that the line is free for other calls that may be on the Judge's calendar. The parties are reminded that they should be prepared to address whether they consent to have all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge and whether they wish to participate in a mediation session with a Magistrate Judge, whether before, during, or after discovery. Parties are expected to consult with their clients and confer with each other on these issues in advance of the Rule 16 Case Management Conference and, if possible, present joint views to the Court. (hos, Chambers)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 6/29/2020.. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 2/13/2020. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
February 11, 2020 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by New York Mart MD, Inc. (Hsur, Michael)
February 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Pochin Hsur on behalf of Long Deng, New York Mart MD, Inc. (Hsur, Michael)
February 11, 2020 Filing 8 Defendants Long Deng and New York Mart MD, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint of Ana D. Gonzalez by Long Deng, New York Mart MD, Inc..(Hsur, Michael)
February 10, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ana D. Gonzalez. New York Mart MD, Inc. served on 1/10/2020, answer due 1/31/2020.(Kurzyna, Mariusz)
February 10, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ana D. Gonzalez. (Kurzyna, Mariusz)
February 4, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ana D. Gonzalez. Long Deng served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/11/2020.(Kurzyna, Mariusz)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 1/10/2020. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Long Deng, New York Mart MD, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ybs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 1/6/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
January 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8433324.), filed by Ana D. Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons New York Mart MD, Inc., #3 Summons Long Deng)(Kurzyna, Mariusz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. New York Mart MD, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, (2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Deng
Represented By: Michael Pochin Hsur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, (1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Mart MD, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Pochin Hsur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana D. Gonzalez
Represented By: Mariusz Kurzyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?