King et al v. Western Maryland Health System Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Scott E King, Carolyn S King and Corey J King
Defendant: diana pepe, MEP Observation Services, LLC, MEP of Cumberland, LLC, Sound Inpatient Physicians, Inc., South Sound Inpatient Physicians, LLC, saad mahmood, muhammad Afzal, USACS of Maryland, LLC, Hospitalist Medicine Physicians, PC, MEP Health, LLC and Western Maryland Health System Corporation
Case Number: 8:2020cv00225
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by USACS of Maryland, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Prayer for Jury Trial)(Bender, Steffany)
March 12, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by MEP of Cumberland, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Prayer for Jury Trial)(Bender, Steffany)
March 12, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by MEP Observation Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Prayer for Jury Trial)(Bender, Steffany)
March 12, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by MEP Health, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Prayer for Jury Trial)(Bender, Steffany)
March 12, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Diana Pepe. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Prayer for Jury Trial)(Bender, Steffany)
March 4, 2020 Filing 15 Jury Trial Demand by Hospitalist Medicine Physicians of Maryland, PC, Sound Inpatient Physicians, Inc., South Sound Inpatient Physicians, LLC(Robinson, James)
March 4, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by South Sound Inpatient Physicians, LLC.(Robinson, James)
March 4, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Hospitalist Medicine Physicians of Maryland, PC.(Robinson, James)
March 4, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Sound Inpatient Physicians, Inc..(Robinson, James)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #10 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Filing Responsive Pleading. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/3/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
March 2, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Diana Pepe(Bender, Steffany)
March 2, 2020 Filing 9 Jury Trial Demand by Western Maryland Health System Corporation(Gilmore, James)
March 2, 2020 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Western Maryland Health System Corporation identifying Corporate Parent UPMC d/b/a University of Pittsburgh Medical Center, Corporate Parent UPMC d/b/a University of Pittsburgh Medical Center for Western Maryland Health System Corporation.(Gilmore, James)
March 2, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Western Maryland Health System Corporation.(Gilmore, James)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #5 Stipulation and Order for Extension of Time for Defendants South Sound Inpatient Physicians, LLC a/k/a South Sound Inpatient Physicians, PLLC T/A Sound Physicians of Maryland and Sound Inpatient Physicians, Inc. T/A Sound Physicians of Maryland II to File Responsive Pleading (up to and including March 4, 2020). Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/2/2020. (jmhs, Chambers)
February 28, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, and Order for Extension of Time for Defendants to File Responsive Pleading by Sound Inpatient Physicians, Inc., South Sound Inpatient Physicians, LLC(Robinson, James)
February 12, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Hospitalist Medicine Physicians of Maryland, PC.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Corey J King Writ of Summons (Fritch, C)
January 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Muhammad Afzal, MEP Health, LLC, MEP Observation Services, LLC, MEP of Cumberland, LLC, Saad Mahmood, Diana Pepe, Sound Inpatient Physicians, Inc., South Sound Inpatient Physicians, LLC, USACS of Maryland, LLC, Western Maryland Health System Corporation.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
January 24, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Peter J. Messitte. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8473370.), filed by Corey J King. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons)(Fritch, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King et al v. Western Maryland Health System Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: diana pepe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEP Observation Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEP of Cumberland, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sound Inpatient Physicians, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Sound Inpatient Physicians, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: saad mahmood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: muhammad Afzal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USACS of Maryland, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospitalist Medicine Physicians, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEP Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Maryland Health System Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott E King
Represented By: Jeffrey L Peek
Represented By: Thomas C Cardaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn S King
Represented By: Jeffrey L Peek
Represented By: Thomas C Cardaro
Represented By: C Drew Fritch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey J King
Represented By: Jeffrey L Peek
Represented By: Thomas C Cardaro
Represented By: C Drew Fritch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?