Ayres et al v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Stephan Ayres and Angela Ayres
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Bank of New York Mellon, N.A. and PHH Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 8:2020cv00275
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Hearing filed by Bank of New York Mellon, N.A., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation.(Dunham, Jordan)
February 25, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand filed by Angela Ayres. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand filed by Bank of New York Mellon, N.A., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation.(Dunham, Jordan)
February 14, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition (Motion to Strike Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) #10 MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Hearing filed by Angela Ayres. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 13, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE re #6 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Bank of New York Mellon, N.A., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation.(Dunham, Jordan)
February 10, 2020 Filing 12 Rule 12/56 notice mailed to Angela Ayres, Stephan Ayres (c/m 2/10/2020 heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 7, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand by Angela Ayres(heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 7, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Hearing by Bank of New York Mellon, N.A., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Dunham, Jordan)
February 5, 2020 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.5a CERTIFICATION OF FILING OF STATE COURT PAPERS(Dunham, Jordan)
February 5, 2020 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Bank of New York Mellon, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for Bank of New York Mellon, N.A..(Dunham, Jordan)
February 5, 2020 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation identifying Corporate Parent OCWEN Financial Corporation for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation.(Dunham, Jordan)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 2/4/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 2/4/20-das)
February 4, 2020 Filing 5 Removal Notification Letter mailed to Plaintiff. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m w/optional email consent form 2/4/20-das)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (FILED IN ERROR PRIOR TO MAILING- Case to be reassigned to Greenbelt Division) Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 2/4/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 4, 2020 Filing 3 (FILED IN ERROR PRIOR TO MAILING- Case to be Reassigned to Greenbelt Division) Removal Notification Letter mailed to Plaintiff. (dass, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 2/4/2020 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
February 4, 2020 Case reassigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. Judge Ellen L. Hollander no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Bank of New York Mellon, N.A., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, filed by Stephan Ayres, Angela Ayres.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 31, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENT (ECF NO.2) IS A COPY OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGES COUNTY. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, case number CAL20-00873. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8487457), filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC Bank of New York Mellon, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Dunham, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayres et al v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Jordan F. E. Dunham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon, N.A.
Represented By: Jordan F. E. Dunham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Jordan F. E. Dunham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephan Ayres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Ayres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?