FrenchPorte, LLC et al v. C.H.I. Overhead Doors, Inc.
Plaintiff: FrenchPorte IP, LLC and FrenchPorte, LLC
Defendant: C.H.I. Overhead Doors, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv00467
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Filing 8 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (Mason, Geoffrey)
March 6, 2020 Filing 7 QC NOTICE: #5 Notice (Other) filed by FrenchPorte, LLC, FrenchPorte IP, LLC was filed incorrectly. **Wrong event used. Please file the form by selecting Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Report on Filing Patent/Trademark. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by FrenchPorte IP, LLC, FrenchPorte, LLC 103.3 Disclosure (Mason, Geoffrey)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 [FILED IN ERROR] NOTICE by FrenchPorte IP, LLC, FrenchPorte, LLC AO 120 Notice (Mason, Geoffrey) Modified on 3/6/2020 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk).
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to C.H.I. Overhead Doors, Inc..(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by FrenchPorte IP, LLC, FrenchPorte, LLC re #1 Complaint,, Proposed Summons (Mason, Geoffrey)
February 27, 2020 Deficiency Notice FrenchPorte, LLC and FrenchPorte IP, LLC -- Report on Filing Patent/Trademark form (AO 120) has not been filed. The form is located at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/publications/DisplayForms.asp?ActiveTab=Civil . Please fully complete and file the form by selecting Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Report on Filing Patent/Trademark. The form must be filed by 3/5/2020 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 27, 2020 Deficiency Notice: FrenchPorte, LLC and FrenchPorte IP, LLC -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 3/5/2020 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by FrenchPorte, LLC, FrenchPorte IP, LLC was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to #1 Complaint. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Against CHI Overhead Doors against FrenchPorte, LLC, FrenchPorte IP, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8534669.), filed by FrenchPorte, LLC, FrenchPorte IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Hormann Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit Exhibit M)(Mason, Geoffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FrenchPorte, LLC et al v. C.H.I. Overhead Doors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FrenchPorte IP, LLC
Represented By: Geoffrey Colbourne Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FrenchPorte, LLC
Represented By: Geoffrey Colbourne Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.H.I. Overhead Doors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?