Washington v. Wexford Health Sources, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Keith Washington
Defendant: Jason Clem, M.D. and Wexford Health Sources Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv00683
Filed: March 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/22/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Keith Washington (Veltman, Dawn)
April 16, 2020 Filing 6 QC NOTICE: #5 Miscellaneous Correspondence was filed incorrectly. **Wrong event was used. Please re-file the document by selecting Other Filings Other Documents Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement. ***Please enter corporate parent/affiliate(s) when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 15, 2020 Filing 5 [FILED IN ERROR] Correspondence re: Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure of Corporate Interest (Wolf, Samuel) Modified on 4/16/2020 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk).
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jason Clem, M.D., Wexford Health Sources Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Wolf, Samuel)
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Keith Washington was filed incorrectly. **In the future, please file Notice of Appearance separately. Each attorney must file their own Notice of Appearance using the appropriate event and own user log in. No action is required. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
March 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Jason Clem, M.D., Wexford Health Sources Inc..(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
March 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
March 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8571084.), filed by Keith Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Summons Def 1, #5 Summons Summons Def 2, #6 Attachment Attorney Appearance)(Veltman, Dawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Wexford Health Sources, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Clem, M.D.
Represented By: Samuel Thomas Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Thomas Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Washington
Represented By: Jo Ann Camm
Represented By: Dawn S Veltman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?