McMurray v. Richard et al
Plaintiff: Kara Lynn McMurray
Defendant: Prince George's County, Maryland and Lt. Richard John Tallant
Case Number: 8:2020cv00919
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Prince George's County, Maryland.(Whitted, Stephen)
May 11, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kara Lynn McMurray.(Roberts, Terrell)
May 8, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Stephen Earl Whitted on behalf of Prince George's County, Maryland (Whitted, Stephen)
May 8, 2020 Filing 20 Supplemental to #7 Amended Complaint filed by Prince George's County, Maryland Amended Complaint (Clean copy) (Whitted, Stephen) Modified on 5/8/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
May 7, 2020 Filing 19 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Kara Lynn McMurray (Roberts, Terrell)
May 4, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimas to Count III and Count IV filed by Richard John Tallant.(Ball, Chaz)
May 4, 2020 Filing 17 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Richard John Tallant (Ball, Chaz)
May 4, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by Prince George's County, Maryland re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 15 QC Notice - Miscellaneous, Proposed Order on Motion to Dismiss (Whitted, Stephen)
May 1, 2020 Filing 15 QC NOTICE: #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Prince George's County, Maryland was filed incorrectly. **Information on proposed order is for the incorrect court. Please file an updated proposed order with correct case number and court information. File using the event "Supplemental" and link to the motion #14 . (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
May 1, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Prince George's County, Maryland (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Whitted, Stephen)
April 30, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimas to Count III and Count IV filed by Kara Lynn McMurray.(Roberts, Terrell)
April 28, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimas to Count III and Count IV by Richard John Tallant (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Ball, Chaz)
April 23, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Chaz Romeo Ball on behalf of Richard John Tallant (Ball, Chaz)
April 17, 2020 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Prince George's County, Maryland (Whitted, Stephen)
April 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Prince George's County, Maryland re #8 Standing Order Concerning Removal (Whitted, Stephen)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 4/15/2020. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
April 15, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED State Court COMPLAINT against Prince George's County, Maryland, Richard John Tallant, filed by Kara Lynn McMurray.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
April 15, 2020 Filing 6 State Court COMPLAINT against Prince George's County, Maryland, Richard John Tallant, filed by Kara Lynn McMurray.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
April 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Prince George's County, Maryland re #1 Complaint, (Whitted, Stephen)
April 15, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (6-7) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
April 10, 2020 Filing 4 Supplemental to #1 Complaint, filed by Prince George's County, Maryland (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Amended Complaiknt, #3 Summons Writ of Sumons - County)(Whitted, Stephen)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Prince George's Cty, Md was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Civil Cover Sheet. To correct this problem, file Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) and link Civil Cover Sheet to #1 . (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Prince George's Cty, Md was filed incorrectly. **State court documents must be separated and labeled. Each state court document (i.e., complaint, summons, etc.) must be properly labeled and filed as separate attachments. Please refile each attachment using the "Other Documents" category, select the "Supplemental" event, and link filing to 1 Notice of Removal. The first labeled attachment can be the main document and the other labeled documents as separate attachments. File any pending motions as separate docket entries (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Prince George's County, Mary, case number CAl20-05415. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8604457.), filed by Prince George's Cty, Md. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Complinat, #2 Attachment Amended Complaint)(Whitted, Stephen) Modified on 4/8/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMurray v. Richard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kara Lynn McMurray
Represented By: Terrell N Roberts, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prince George's County, Maryland
Represented By: Stephen Earl Whitted
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Richard John Tallant
Represented By: Chaz Romeo Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?