Howes v. Raymond James & Associates et al
Plaintiff: Thomas W. Howes
Defendant: IFS Securities, Raymond James & Associates, Inc. and Raymond James & Associates
Case Number: 8:2020cv00924
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Clarification and Reconsideration by Thomas W. Howes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 LETTER ORDER staying this case against IFS Securities; denying Mr. Howes request to remand this Case to the Montgomery County Circuit Court. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 5/11/2020. (cm 5/11/2020 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 4, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE re #14 Response to Plaintiff Thomas W. Howes' Opposition to Notice of Removal filed by Raymond James & Associates. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Preteroti, Kelly)
April 27, 2020 Filing 15 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by IFS Securities(West, James)
April 20, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE (Opposition) to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Thomas W. Howes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
April 17, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE re #1 Notice of Removal, Response to Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Raymond James & Associates.(Preteroti, Kelly)
April 15, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE re #5 Complaint, Opposition to Petition to Vacate and Remand Arbitration Award filed by IFS Securities.(West, James)
April 15, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by IFS Securities re #1 Notice of Removal, Statement Confirming Consent to Notice of Removal (West, James)
April 15, 2020 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by IFS Securities identifying Corporate Parent IFS Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Alexys Ulando McKenzie, Other Affiliate Joquinn Thomas Sadler, Other Affiliate Janet Bentley-Ewers for IFS Securities.(West, James)
April 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James H West on behalf of IFS Securities (West, James)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 4/9/2020. (c/m 4/9/2020 heps, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 4/9/2020 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 Removal Notification Letter (c/m 4/9/2020 - dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 4/9/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 9, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4-5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR MONTGOMERY COUNTY, MARYLAND. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT to #4 COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 4/9/2020 (heps, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 4/15/2020 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk).
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT by Thomas W. Howes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 4/9/2020 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 Respondent's Opposition to Plaintiff's Petition by Raymond James & Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Text of Proposed Order)(Preteroti, Kelly) Modified on 4/9/2020 (heps, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 4/9/2020 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Raymond James & Associates, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Raymond James Financial, Inc. for Raymond James & Associates, Inc..(Preteroti, Kelly)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County Circuit Court, case number 479795-V. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8605011), filed by Raymond James & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Preteroti, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howes v. Raymond James & Associates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IFS Securities
Represented By: James H West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond James & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: KYLE S KUSHNER
Represented By: Kelly M Preteroti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond James & Associates
Represented By: KYLE S KUSHNER
Represented By: Kelly M Preteroti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas W. Howes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?