AO LLC v. Pet Parents, LLC
Plaintiff: AO LLC
Defendant: Pet Parents LLC and Pet Parents, LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv00925
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CORRECTED SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 11/10/2020. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/1/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 LETTER ORDER that the Court has scheduled a Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 telephone conference call on June 22, 2020 at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/1/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Initial Discovery Protocols)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 11/10/2020. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/1/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
May 29, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Pet Parents, LLC.(Leibowitz, Louis)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is May 29, 2020. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 5/20/2020. (imws, Chambers)
May 19, 2020 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by AO LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ebersohl, Lori)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Consent Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due 5/19/2020.. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 5/5/2020. (bus, Deputy Clerk)
May 5, 2020 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by AO LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ebersohl, Lori) Modified on 5/5/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
April 30, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AO LLC. Pet Parents, LLC served on 4/14/2020, answer due 5/5/2020.(Ebersohl, Lori)
April 24, 2020 Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of James Randy Michels. Directing attorney James Randy Michels to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 4/24/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
April 24, 2020 Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kevin P Hartley. Directing attorney Kevin P Hartley to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 4/24/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
April 24, 2020 Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of William C Ferrell, Jr. Directing attorney William C Ferrell, Jr to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 4/24/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
April 23, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James R. Michels (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8624240.) by AO LLC(Ebersohl, Lori)
April 23, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kevin P. Hartley (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8624229.) by AO LLC(Ebersohl, Lori)
April 23, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William C. Ferrell, Jr. (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8624219.) by AO LLC(Ebersohl, Lori)
April 14, 2020 Filing 6 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (Ebersohl, Lori)
April 10, 2020 Filing 5 Deficiency Notice -- Report on Filing Patent/Trademark form (AO 120) has not been filed. The form is located at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/publications/DisplayForms.asp?ActiveTab=Civil . Please fully complete and file the form by selecting Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Report on Filing Patent/Trademark. The form must be filed by 4/17/2020. Thank you. (tds, Deputy Clerk)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 4/9/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Pet Parents, LLC. (tds, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by AO LLC (Ebersohl, Lori)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pet Parents LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8605328.), filed by AO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Summons)(Ebersohl, Lori)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AO LLC v. Pet Parents, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AO LLC
Represented By: Lori Vaughn Ebersohl
Represented By: William C Ferrell, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin P Hartley
Represented By: James Randy Michels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pet Parents LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pet Parents, LLC
Represented By: Louis Michael Leibowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?