Rios et al v. Potomac Restaurant Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Immer Rios, Jilberto Rios and Jorge Rios
Defendant: Ashley Jeanne Grolig, Michael Angelo Colella, Potomac Restaurant Group, Inc., Enzo Z. Iachetti and Oscar Contreras
Case Number: 8:2020cv00939
Filed: April 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Michael Angelo Colella, Oscar Contreras, Ashley Jeanne Grolig, Potomac Restaurant Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exh. 1 - Renato's Wall, #3 Exhibit Exh. 2a - Jorge Rios Actual Pay Chart, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2b - Immer Rios Actual Pay Chart, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Dismiss Am. Complaint)(Pare Johnson, Alice)
June 9, 2020 Filing 13 Line to Withdraw Motion to Strike by Michael Angelo Colella, Oscar Contreras, Ashley Jeanne Grolig, Potomac Restaurant Group, Inc. re #10 MOTION to Strike #8 Amended Complaint (Pare Johnson, Alice) Modified on 6/9/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
June 9, 2020 Filing 12 QC NOTICE: #11 Unredacted Document filed by Ashley Jeanne Grolig, Potomac Restaurant Group, Inc., Michael Angelo Colella, Oscar Contreras was filed incorrectly. Refile using the event "Notice (Other)" **Incorrect event used. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
June 8, 2020 Filing 11 (FILED IN ERROR) UNREDACTED DOCUMENT (Pare Johnson, Alice) Modified on 6/9/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
June 4, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Strike #8 Amended Complaint by Michael Angelo Colella, Ashley Jeanne Grolig, Potomac Restaurant Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaints Filed by Plaintiffs, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Pare Johnson, Alice)
May 20, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued 21 days as to Oscar Contreras.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael Angelo Colella, Ashley Jeanne Grolig, Potomac Restaurant Group, Inc., Oscar Contreras, filed by Immer Rios, Jilberto Rios, Jorge Rios. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Redline)(Zelikovitz, Justin)
May 8, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION to Dismiss , #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Michael Angelo Colella, Ashley Jeanne Grolig, Potomac Restaurant Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit Oscar Contreras, #2 Affidavit Affidavit Michael Colella)(Pare Johnson, Alice) Modified on 5/8/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Michael Angelo Colella, Ashley Jeanne Grolig, Potomac Restaurant Group, Inc.(Pare Johnson, Alice)
May 7, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Michael Angelo Colella, Ashley Jeanne Grolig, Potomac Restaurant Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum to Support Mtn to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Paystubs, #3 Exhibit Quicken Weekly Tip Report, #4 Exhibit Combined Wage and Tips, #5 Exhibit Montgomery Co. Minimum Wage)(Pare Johnson, Alice)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Alice Ann Pare Johnson on behalf of All Defendants (Pare Johnson, Alice)
April 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Enzo Z. Iacheti by Jilberto Rios, Jorge Rios, Immer Rios (Zelikovitz, Justin) Modified on 4/17/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
April 13, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Michael Angelo Colella, Ashley Jeanne Grolig, Enzo Z. Iachetti, Potomac Restaurant Group, Inc..(rss, Deputy Clerk)
April 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8608936.), filed by Immer Rios, Jilberto Rios, Jorge Rios. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons (4))(Zelikovitz, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rios et al v. Potomac Restaurant Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Immer Rios
Represented By: Justin Zelikovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jilberto Rios
Represented By: Justin Zelikovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Rios
Represented By: Justin Zelikovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Jeanne Grolig
Represented By: Alice Ann Pare Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Angelo Colella
Represented By: Alice Ann Pare Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Potomac Restaurant Group, Inc.
Represented By: Alice Ann Pare Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enzo Z. Iachetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oscar Contreras
Represented By: Alice Ann Pare Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?