Federal Realty Investment Trust v. PHI Trading Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Federal Realty Investment Trust
Defendant: PHI Holding Company, LLC, PHI Enterprises, LTD and PHI Trading Company, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Armstrong Flooring
3Rd Party Defendant: Kaindl Flooring GmbH
Case Number: 8:2020cv01170
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Filing 31 ANSWER to #24 Amended Complaint by PHI Enterprises, LTD, PHI Holding Company, LLC, PHI Trading Company, Inc..(Bass, Timothy)
June 16, 2020 Filing 30 ANSWER to #24 Amended Complaint by Armstrong Flooring.(Berkowitz, Matthew)
June 15, 2020 Filing 29 Third Party Summons Issued 21 days as to Kaindl Flooring GmbH.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
June 15, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE by Armstrong Flooring re #25 Third Party Complaint (Berkowitz, Matthew)
June 15, 2020 Filing 27 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE by Armstrong Flooring re #25 Third Party Complaint (Berkowitz, Matthew) Modified on 6/15/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
June 15, 2020 Filing 26 QC NOTICE: #25 Third Party Complaint filed by Armstrong Flooring was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Third Party Summons. To correct this problem, file Third Party Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Third Party Summons to #25 . (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
June 12, 2020 Filing 25 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Kaindl Flooring GmbH, filed by Armstrong Flooring. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Products Supply Agmt, #3 Exhibit C-Terms and Conditions)(Berkowitz, Matthew)
June 2, 2020 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Federal Realty Investment Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Redline of Amended Complaint)(Pavlides, Matthew)
May 29, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Armstrong Flooring.(Berkowitz, Matthew)
May 28, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE by Federal Realty Investment Trust of Plaintiff's Disclosure of Damage Claims and Relief Sought (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Garcia, Eduardo)
May 19, 2020 Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Robert W Angle. Directing attorney Robert W Angle to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 5/19/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
May 19, 2020 Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John Francis Scalia. Directing attorney John Francis Scalia to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 5/19/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
May 18, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert W. Angle (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8656623.) by PHI Enterprises, LTD, PHI Holding Company, LLC, PHI Trading Company, Inc.(Bass, Timothy)
May 18, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John F. Scalia (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8656600.) by PHI Enterprises, LTD, PHI Holding Company, LLC, PHI Trading Company, Inc.(Bass, Timothy)
May 18, 2020 Filing 17 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Federal Realty Investment Trust identifying Other Affiliate Street Retail, Inc., Other Affiliate Andorra Associates, Other Affiliate Berman Enterprises II Limited Partnership, Other Affiliate Governor Plaza Associates, Other Affiliate Shopping Center Associates, Other Affiliate FR Associates Limited Partnership, Other Affiliate Federal/LPF GP, Inc., Other Affiliate Federal/Lion Venture LP, Other Affiliate FR White Marsh, Inc., Other Affiliate Federal Realty Management Services, Inc., Other Affiliate FR Chelsea Commons I, Inc., Other Affiliate FR Linden Square, Inc., Other Affiliate FR Rollingwood, LLC, Other Affiliate FR Assembly Square, LLC, Other Affiliate FRIT Leasing & Development Services, Inc., Other Affiliate FR Shoppers World, Inc., Other Affiliate FR Pike 7 Limited Partnership, Other Affiliate Congressional Plaza Associates, LLC, Other Affiliate Federal Realty Partners, Inc., Other Affiliate FRLP, Inc., Other Affiliate The Avenue at White Marsh Business Trust, Other Affiliate WHITE MARSH PLAZA BUSINESS TRUST, Other Affiliate Pike & Rose Condominium, Inc., Other Affiliate FRIT Escondido Promenade, LLC, Other Affiliate Federal Realty Partners L.P., Other Affiliate FR East Bay Bridge, LLC, Other Affiliate East Bay Bridge Retail, LLC, Other Affiliate FRIT Solar, Inc., Other Affiliate Santana Row ROF, Inc., Other Affiliate FR Mercer Mall, LLC, Other Affiliate FR Westgate Mall, LLC, Other Affiliate FR Crow Canyon, LLC, Other Affiliate FR Chelsea Commons I, LLC, Other Affiliate Cordon Fairfield Business Trust, Other Affiliate Campbell-Philadelphia Business Trust, Other Affiliate Shoppes at Nottingham Square Business Trust, Other Affiliate Retail Properties Business Trust, Other Affiliate Nottingham Square Business Trust, Other Affiliate White Marsh Plaza, LLC, Other Affiliate White Marsh Plaza Limited Partnership, Other Affiliate Byron Station, LLC, Other Affiliate Byron Station, LLC Maryland Byron Station Limited, Other Affiliate Byron Station, LLC, Other Affiliate Byron Station Limited Partnership, LLLP, Other Affiliate NVI-Avenue, LLC, Other Affiliate FR Shoppers World, LLC, Other Affiliate FR Florida, Inc., Other Affiliate FR Rollingwood, Inc., Other Affiliate Federal Realty West Coast, Inc., Other Affiliate FR Montrose Crossing, Inc., Other Affiliate FR Montrose Crossing, LLC, Other Affiliate FR Montrose Crossing Borrower, LLC, Other Affiliate FRIT CA Operations, Inc., Other Affiliate FR Huntington Square, LLC, Other Affiliate FR Darien, LLC, Other Affiliate FR Hastings Ranch, LLC, Other Affiliate FR Riverpoint, LLC, Other Affiliate SRI/CM 4th Street JV, LLC, Other Affiliate SRI Old Town, LLC, Other Affiliate Street Retail West I, L.P., Other Affiliate Street Retail West II, L.P., Other Affiliate Street Retail West 3, L.P., Other Affiliate Street Retail West 4, L.P., Other Affiliate Street Retail West 6, L.P., Other Affiliate Street Retail West 7, L.P., Other Affiliate Street Retail West 10, L.P., Other Affiliate FRIT San Jose Town and Country Village, LLC, Other Affiliate Assembly Row 5B, LLC, Other Affiliate SRI Assembly Row B7, LLC, Other Affiliate SRI Assembly Row B8, LLC, Other Affiliate SRI Assembly Row B9, LLC, Other Affiliate Santana Row Services, Inc., Other Affiliate SRI/Continental JV, LLC, Other Affiliate CCA Sepulveda, LLC, Other Affiliate Rosecrans-Sepulveda Partners 3, LLC, Other Affiliate PES Partners, LLC, Other Affiliate The Grove Fee Owner, LLC, Other Affiliate Route 35 Shrewsbury Limited Partnership, Other Affiliate Shrewsbury Commons L.P., Other Affiliate Sea Girt Limited Partnership, Other Affiliate 35 West, LLC, Other Affiliate Merritt Shrewsbury Commons LLC, Other Affiliate Cole Grove West, LLC, Other Affiliate FR 508 Broad, LLC, Other Affiliate FR San Antonio Center, LLC, Other Affiliate San Antonio Center II, LLC, Other Affiliate PNR Hotel XXVI JV LLC, Other Affiliate PNR Hotel XXVI Owner LLC, Other Affiliate PNR Hotel XXVI Operator LLC, Other Affiliate SR Winchester, LLC, Other Affiliate Assembly Row Condominium, Inc., Other Affiliate SRI Assembly Row Hotel, Inc., Other Affiliate Assembly Row Hotel Operator, LLC, Other Affiliate Assembly Row Hotel, LLC, Other Affiliate FRIT Shops at Sunset Place, LLC, Other Affiliate FRIT Shops at Sunset Place Owner, LLC, Other Affiliate FRIT Shops at Sunset Place Fee Owner, LLC, Other Affiliate FRIT Cocowalk, LLC, Other Affiliate FRIT Cocowalk Owner, LLC, Other Affiliate 3112 Commodore Plaza Investments, Inc., Other Affiliate 3131 Commodore Plaza Investments, Inc., Other Affiliate 3206 Grand Avenue, LLC, Other Affiliate 3406 Main Highway, LLC, Other Affiliate 3419 Main Highway Investments, LLC, Other Affiliate FLV Campus Plaza GP, LLC, Other Affiliate FLV Campus Plaza Limited Partnership, Other Affiliate FLV Plaza del Mercado, LLC, Other Affiliate FLV Plaza del Mercado, LP, Other Affiliate FLV Greenlawn Plaza GP, LLC, Other Affiliate FLV Greenlawn Plaza, LP, Other Affiliate FLV Barcroft Plaza GP, LLC, Other Affiliate FLV Barcroft Plaza, LP, Other Affiliate FLV Free State GP, LLC, Other Affiliate FLV Free State Limited Partnership, Other Affiliate South Gate Joint Venture, LLC, Other Affiliate Primestor/FRIT JV, LLC, Other Affiliate Azalea Joint Venture, LLC, Other Affiliate Prime/FRIT Alameda, LLC, Other Affiliate Prime/FRIT Bell Gardens, LLC, Other Affiliate Prime/FRIT El Monte, LLC, Other Affiliate Prime/FRIT El Portal, LLC, Other Affiliate Prime/FRIT Los Jardines, LLC, Other Affiliate Prime/FRIT Mission Hills, LLC, Other Affiliate Prime/FRIT SCP, LLC, Other Affiliate Prime/FRIT Sylmar, LLC, Other Affiliate Prime/FRIT TRS JV, LLC, Other Affiliate Prime/FRIT Plaza Pacoima, LLC, Other Affiliate Prime/FRIT Olivo Land, LLC, Other Affiliate Primestor/FRIT Jordan Downs JV, LLC, Other Affiliate Primestor Jordan Downs, LLC, Other Affiliate Primestor Development Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate RevUp, Inc., Other Affiliate FR Fairfax Junction. LLC, Other Affiliate SRI UNLMTD JV, LLC, Other Affiliate SRA-WSA Properties I, LLC, Other Affiliate SRA-WSA Properties II, LLC, Other Affiliate SRA-WSA 214 Washington, LLC, Other Affiliate SRA-WSA 302 Washington, LLC, Other Affiliate SRA-WSA 600 Washington, LLC, Other Affiliate SRA-WSA 210 14th, LLC for Federal Realty Investment Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Garcia, Eduardo)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LETTER ORDER scheduling a telephone conference call on June 4, 2020 at 1:00pm.. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 5/18/2020. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 5/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Initial Discovery Protocols)(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 10/27/2020.. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 5/18/2020. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
May 15, 2020 Filing 13 QC NOTICE: #12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Federal Realty Investment Trust was filed incorrectly. **Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement was filed incorrectly. Please enter all corporate parent/affiliate(s) when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
May 15, 2020 Filing 12 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Federal Realty Investment Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Garcia, Eduardo) Modified on 5/15/2020 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
May 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Yasmin Bagha on behalf of Armstrong Flooring (Bagha, Yasmin)
May 14, 2020 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Armstrong Flooring (Berkowitz, Matthew)
May 13, 2020 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by PHI Enterprises, LTD, PHI Holding Company, LLC, PHI Trading Company, Inc. (Bass, Timothy)
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by PHI Enterprises, LTD, PHI Holding Company, LLC, PHI Trading Company, Inc..(Bass, Timothy)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Armstrong Flooring to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint is extended from May 15, 2020, to June 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 5/13/2020. (pk3s, Chambers)
May 13, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Armstrong Flooring (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Matthew)
May 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Federal Realty Investment Trust filing Statement Regarding Removal (Garcia, Eduardo)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 5/8/2020. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR MONTGOMERY COUNTY. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 LETTER ORDER REGARDING THE FILING OF MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 5/8/2020. (rss, Deputy Clerk)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 State Court COMPLAINT against Armstrong Flooring, PHI Enterprises, LTD, PHI Holding Company, LLC, PHI Trading Company, Inc., filed by Federal Realty Investment Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(rss, Deputy Clerk)
May 7, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Maryland for Montgomery County, case number 480804-V. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8643291), filed by PHI Enterprises, LTD, PHI Holding Company, LLC, PHI Trading Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Bass, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Realty Investment Trust v. PHI Trading Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Armstrong Flooring
Represented By: Yasmin Bagha
Represented By: Matthew D Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Realty Investment Trust
Represented By: Eduardo Samuel Garcia
Represented By: Matthew John Pavlides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHI Holding Company, LLC
Represented By: Timothy C Bass
Represented By: John Francis Scalia
Represented By: Robert Woodson Angle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHI Enterprises, LTD
Represented By: Timothy C Bass
Represented By: John Francis Scalia
Represented By: Robert Woodson Angle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHI Trading Company, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy C Bass
Represented By: John Francis Scalia
Represented By: Robert Woodson Angle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Kaindl Flooring GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?