Archer v. United States of America
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA ARCHER
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 8:2020cv01257
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christina Archer , SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christina Archer. United States of America served on 6/1/2020, answer due 7/31/2020.(Valente, John)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christina Archer. United States of America served on 5/27/2020, answer due 7/27/2020.(Valente, John)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 5/22/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued 60 days as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(heps, Deputy Clerk)
May 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John P Valente, III on behalf of Christina Archer (heps, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8659954.), filed by CHRISTINA ARCHER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Entry of Appearance, #3 Summons Request for Summons - Robert K. Hur, #4 Summons Request for Summons - William Barr)(Valente, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Archer v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA ARCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?