Bellamy v. Walmart, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Clifton Bellamy
Defendant: Walmart, Inc., Walmart, Store 1717 and Jessica Wagner
Case Number: 8:2020cv01352
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 7/9/2020. (c/m 7/9/2020 - dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Jessica Wagner, Walmart, Inc., Walmart, Store 1717. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(c/em USMS 7/8/2020 - dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis(SIGNED) by Clifton Bellamy (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting the plaintiff 21 days from the date of this Order to complete USMS forms and summons and return them to the Clerk; granting the plaintiff 21 days to file a signed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; directing the Clerk to issue summons upon receipt of forms. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 6/12/2020. (c/m w/forms as directed 6/12/2020 - dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Clifton Bellamy(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jessica Wagner, Walmart, Inc., Walmart, Store 1717, filed by Clifton Bellamy. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellamy v. Walmart, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifton Bellamy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Store 1717
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?